Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2916649

EP2916649 - LAYING NEST WITH EXPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uniq AG
Bleicherweg 45
8027 Zürich / CH
[2016/50]
Former [2016/44]For all designated states
Volito B.V.
Newtonstraat 27
3902 HP Veenendaal / NL
Former [2015/38]For all designated states
Uniq AG
Bleicherweg 45
8027 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / DONKER, Johannes, Albert
c/o Bleicherweg 45
CH-8027 Zürich / CH
02 / LUTTELS, Frank
c/o Bleicherweg 45
CH-8027 Zürich / CH
 [2015/38]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/38]
Former [2015/38]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13801817.108.11.2013
[2015/38]
WO2013IB60001
Priority number, dateNL2012200978009.11.2012         Original published format: NL 2009780
[2015/38]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014072945
Date:15.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2916649
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2916649
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01K31/16
[2015/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEGENEST MIT VERTREIBUNGSSYSTEM[2015/38]
English:LAYING NEST WITH EXPULSION SYSTEM[2015/38]
French:PONDOIR AYANT UN SYSTÈME D'EXPULSION[2015/38]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2015National basic fee paid 
05.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/38]
01.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2016Fee for grant paid
27.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201503   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2016
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.11.2013
AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
MT08.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/43]HU08.11.2013
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
MT08.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU08.11.2013
AT21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/52]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/48]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]NL9301627  (TEUNIS VAN GENT) [AD] 1-4 * pages 4, 5; figures 1-3 *
 NL8602398  [ ] (ALBRECHT HENDRIK JANSEN)
 NL9301627  [ ]