Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2931758

EP2931758 - PROCESS FOR DEGASSING AND BUFFERING POLYOLEFIN PARTICLES OBTAINED BY OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / PENZO, Giuseppe
P. le Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
02 / MEI, Giulia
Via XX Settembre
52
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
03 / MEI, Gabriele
P.le Donegani
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
04 / DE LUCIA, Antonio
Kruithuisstraat 4
NL-1018 WW Amsterdam / NL
05 / BAITA, Pietro
P. le Donegani 12
I-44122 Ferrara / IT
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan , et al
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date13802400.511.12.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013EP76185
Priority number, dateEP2012019645011.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12196450
[2015/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014090856
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2931758
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F6/00, C08F10/00, C08L23/00
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ENTGASUNG UND ZUM PUFFERN VON DURCH OLEFINPOLYMERISIERUNG GEWONNENEN POLYOLEFINPARTIKELN[2015/43]
English:PROCESS FOR DEGASSING AND BUFFERING POLYOLEFIN PARTICLES OBTAINED BY OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION[2015/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉGAZAGE ET DE TAMPONNAGE DE PARTICULES DE POLYOLÉFINES OBTENUES PAR POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2015National basic fee paid 
22.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2008015228  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * examples and claims; page 10, line 17 - line 19 *;
 [I]WO2011097119  (CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0094] *;
 [I]WO2006026493  (CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CO [US]) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0035] , [0091] , [0127] *