Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2853012

EP2853012 - DISCONNECTOR FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bremas Ersce S.p.A.
Via Castellazzo 9
20040 Cambiago / IT
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / CIVETTINI, Franco
Via Gilles Villeneuve 73
I-25030 Castel Mella / IT
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/27]
Former [2015/14]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners (IT)
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13802609.106.12.2013
[2017/27]
WO2013EP75828
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0217519.12.2012         Original published format: IT MI20122175
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014095431
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2853012
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2853012
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/08, H01H1/42, H01H19/10, H01H19/64
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRENNSCHALTER FÜR FOTOVOLTAISCHE ANWENDUNGEN[2015/14]
English:DISCONNECTOR FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC APPLICATIONS[2015/14]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉCONNEXION POUR APPLICATIONS PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES[2015/14]
Entry into regional phase24.12.2014National basic fee paid 
24.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/14]
11.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2017Fee for grant paid
24.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2017
Opposition(s)06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2013
AT05.07.2017
CY05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
MK05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU06.12.2013
AT05.07.2017
CY05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/31]HU06.12.2013
AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
IE06.12.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
LU06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2107581  (SANTON GROUP B V [NL] EWAC HOLDING B V [NL]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1-8B * [Y] 3,9
 [Y]EP0297055  (BRETER SPA [IT] BRETER SRL [IT]) [Y] 3,9 * column 3, line 50 - column 8, line 50; figures 1-15 *
 [A]WO2012168553  (ABB OY [FI]; UITTO OSKARI [FI]; SUUTARINEN AKI [FI]; KOLMONEN RAINER [) [A] 1 * page 4, line 25 - page 22, line 36; figures 1-20 *