Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2925270

EP2925270 - CLIP FOR CONNECTING A SLING WITH A LIFTING ARM OF A HOIST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, IS, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOSH IP I B.V.
3e Loosterlaan 3
9699 PP Vriescheloo / NL
[2019/03]
Former [2016/15]For all designated states
JOSH IP B.V.
3e Loosterlaan 3
9699 PP Vriescheloo / NL
Former [2015/41]For all designated states
JOCO Holding B.V.
3e Loosterlaan 3
9699 PP Vriescheloo / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HUIZINGA, Jozef
c/o 3e Loosterlaan 3
NL-9699 PP Vriescheloo / NL
 [2015/41]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/03]
Former [2015/41]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13802739.629.11.2013
[2015/41]
WO2013NL50864
Priority number, dateNL2012200991230.11.2012         Original published format: NL 2009912
[2015/41]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014084740
Date:05.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2925270
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014
[2015/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2925270
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/10
[2015/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLAMMER ZUM VERBINDEN EINER SCHLINGE MIT EINEM HEBEARM EINES HEBEZEUGS[2015/41]
English:CLIP FOR CONNECTING A SLING WITH A LIFTING ARM OF A HOIST[2015/41]
French:ATTACHE POUR RACCORDER UNE ÉLINGUE À UN BRAS DE LEVAGE D'UN TREUIL[2015/41]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2015National basic fee paid 
23.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/41]
26.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2018Fee for grant paid
05.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2007035098  (JOYINCARE GROUP B V [NL]; DE KRUIJF WILHELMUS PETRUS JOH [NL]; HUIZING) [XD] 1,2,4,14-17 * paragraph [0019]; figures 5-8 * [I] 5,7,8
 [XD]EP1440676  (IDISS BEHEER B V [NL] EXODUS HOLDING B V [NL]) [XD] 1,4,8,14,17 * paragraph [0036]; figures 5a-c, 6 *
 [XA]US3680914  (STEPHENSON ROBERT L ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,14,16 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 44 * [A] 5
 [XA]EP2450021  (CARE AND INDEPENDENCE SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,14-17 * paragraphs [0013] - [0026]; figures 2a-b, 5a-b * [A] 5
 [XI]US2004159208  (YASUNORI MASATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0039]; figures 1a-b, 2, 3a-c * [I] 7