Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2946251

EP2946251 - SUPPORT FOR A TIMEPIECE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse
Schild-Rust-Strasse 17
2540 Grenchen / CH
[2017/08]
Former [2015/48]For all designated states
ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse
Schild-Rust-Strasse 17
2540 Grenchen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BALMER, Raphaël
Route de Recolaine 38
2824 Vicques / CH
02 / KLOPFENSTEIN, François
Rue de la Fenaison 20
CH-2800 Delémont / CH
 [2015/50]
Former [2015/48]01 / BALMER, Raphaël
Rue du 23 Juin 6
CH-2830 Courrendlin / CH
02 / KLOPFENSTEIN, François
Rue de la Fenaison 20
CH-2800 Delémont / CH
Representative(s)Goulette, Ludivine , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2017/08]
Former [2015/48]Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
Application number, filing date13803036.612.12.2013
[2015/48]
WO2013EP76444
Priority number, dateEP2013015180318.01.2013         Original published format: EP 13151803
[2015/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014111210
Date:24.07.2014
Language:FR
[2014/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2946251
Date:25.11.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014
[2015/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2946251
Date:22.02.2017
Language:FR
[2017/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G04G17/06, H05K1/02
[2015/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRÄGER FÜR EINEN UHRSENSOR[2015/48]
English:SUPPORT FOR A TIMEPIECE SENSOR[2015/48]
French:SUPPORT POUR CAPTEUR HORLOGER[2015/48]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2015National basic fee paid 
18.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
09.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.01.2017Fee for grant paid
09.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2016
Opposition(s)23.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2013
AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
MT22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MC22.02.2017
MT22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
MT22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SI22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
SM22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
DK22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
PL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
EE22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
IT22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RO22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
SK22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT22.02.2017
CZ22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT22.02.2017
ES22.02.2017
FI22.02.2017
HR22.02.2017
LT22.02.2017
LV22.02.2017
NL22.02.2017
RS22.02.2017
SE22.02.2017
BG22.05.2017
NO22.05.2017
GR23.05.2017
PT22.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010035671  (LEE BYUNG HWA [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] - [0038]; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2010006327  (YU CHENG-PO [TW], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figures 4A,4B *;
 [A]WO2007054557  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 8 - page 9; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2388460  (YEMA [FR]) [A] 2 * page 1 - page 3; figures 1-5 *