Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2928617

EP2928617 - METHOD FOR COMBINING A POSTAL OBJECT WITH SORTED MAIL ITEMS INCLUDING MEANS FOR VISUAL SIGNALLING OF THE INSERTING LOCATION FOR THE POSTAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/42]METHOD FOR MERGING POSTAL MATTER WITH SORTED POST INCLUDING ASSISTANCE BY VISUAL DESIGNATION OF THE SITE OF INSERTION OF THE POSTAL MATTER
[2016/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / CAILLON, Christophe
16 A 18 rue Anatole France
F-91220 Bretigny Sur Orge / FR
02 / MOULLARD, Eric
16 rue Charles Doucet
F-26800 Portes Les Valence / FR
03 / GHEZAL, Mohammed
37 chemin St Jean de Chepy
F-38210 Tullins / FR
 [2016/45]
Former [2015/42]01 / CAILLON, Christophe
16 A 18 rue Anatole France
F-91220 Bretigny Sur Orge / FR
02 / MOULLARD, Eric
16 rue Charles Doucet
F-26800 Portes Les Valence / FR
03 / GHEZAL, Mohammed
5 rue de Thévenet
F-38120 Tullins / FR
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2015/42]
Application number, filing date13803162.020.11.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013FR52805
Priority number, dateFR2012006171606.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1261716
[2015/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014087069
Date:12.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2928617
Date:14.10.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2928617
Date:09.11.2016
Language:FR
[2016/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/00
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENFÜGEN EINES POSTSTÜCKS MIT SORTIERTEM POSTGUT MIT EINER VISUELLEN KENNZEICHNUNGSHILFE DER EINFÜGEPOSITION[2016/33]
English:METHOD FOR COMBINING A POSTAL OBJECT WITH SORTED MAIL ITEMS INCLUDING MEANS FOR VISUAL SIGNALLING OF THE INSERTING LOCATION FOR THE POSTAL OBJECT[2016/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FUSIONNER UN OBJET POSTAL DANS DU COURRIER TRIÉ INCLUANT UNE AIDE PAR DÉSIGNATION VISUELLE DE L'EMPLACEMENT D'INSERTION DE L'OBJET POSTAL[2015/42]
Former [2015/42]VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNG VON POSTSENDUNGEN MIT SORTIERTER POST MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG DURCH VISUELLE EINTEILUNG DER EINWURFORTE DER POSTSENDUNGEN
Former [2015/42]METHOD FOR MERGING POSTAL MATTER WITH SORTED POST INCLUDING ASSISTANCE BY VISUAL DESIGNATION OF THE SITE OF INSERTION OF THE POSTAL MATTER
Entry into regional phase06.07.2015National basic fee paid 
06.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
01.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2016Fee for grant paid
26.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2016
Opposition(s)10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.11.2013
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
MT09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
TR09.11.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU20.11.2013
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
MT09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2018/34]HU20.11.2013
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2018/30]HU20.11.2013
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/43]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/42]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/38]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/37]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/26]ES09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV09.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE102010043389  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] *
 DE102010043389  [ ]