Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829996

EP2829996 - AUTHENTICATION METHOD, AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND AUTHENTICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / HUO, Xuanli
c/o ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Schröer, Gernot H. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date13804741.025.07.2013
WO2013CN80070
Priority number, dateCN20121037961009.10.2012         Original published format: CN201210379610
[2015/05]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013185689
Date:19.12.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829996
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/44, G06F21/78, G06F21/62
[2016/01]
Former International [2015/05]G06F21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2015/05]
English:AUTHENTICATION METHOD, AUTHENTICATION APPARATUS AND AUTHENTICATION DEVICE[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION, APPAREIL D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2014Translation filed 
22.10.2014National basic fee paid 
22.10.2014Search fee paid 
22.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
07.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006020828  (AIHARA KURATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9-12 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0070] * * paragraphs [0112] - [0118] - [0120] * * figures 1,4 * [I] 4;
 [I]US2009006747  (OTSUKA KUNIAKI [JP]) [I] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0065] *;
 [A]US2009270126  (LIU YOUNG-WAY [TW]) [A] 1-4,9-12 * paragraphs [0011] - [0020] *
International search[X]CN101256609  (PHISON ELECTRONICS CORP.);
 [X]CN101090316  (POTEVIO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [X]CN101276432  (POTEVIO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN101404577  (NANJING UNIVERSITY)