Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806615

EP2806615 - TELEPHONE AND TELEPHONE ON-OFF METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/10]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Qiaoqiao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13805213.929.03.2013
[2016/10]
WO2013CN73398
Priority number, dateCN20121032363704.09.2012         Original published format: CN201210323637
[2014/48]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014036828
Date:13.03.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806615
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806615
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.03.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/02
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TELEFON UND TELEFONEIN-/AUSSCHALTVERFAHREN[2014/48]
English:TELEPHONE AND TELEPHONE ON-OFF METHOD[2014/48]
French:TÉLÉPHONE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE SOUS TENSION/HORS TENSION DE TÉLÉPHONE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2013Translation filed 
20.12.2013National basic fee paid 
20.12.2013Search fee paid 
20.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/48]
19.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.12.2015Fee for grant paid
25.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.09.2015
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.03.2013
AL09.03.2016
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
LU29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU29.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
LU29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/31]HU29.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
LU29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU29.03.2013
AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/47]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE29.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.03.2016
BE09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0930762  (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0034]; figure 7 * [A] 3;
 [Y]US2002004410  (SCHULZE HERBERT C [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0042]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0789472  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0329399  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0009]; figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0016]; figures 9,10 *
International search[A]CN2523147Y  (WANG, QINGYUN);
 [A]CN2502464Y  (WANGSHITONG MICROELECTRONIC CO., LTD. GUANGDONG);
 [A]CN201204626Y  (BAN, TAO);
 [A]US6483916  (HU, TIEN-TSE)