Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2806615 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2806615



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 248
13.01.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.02.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
18.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
18.12.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
18.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.09.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
01.09.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
12.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
09.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
23.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
19.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
19.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
19.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
19.03.2015 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 General enquiry Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
21.08.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.04.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
13.03.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 18
18.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 3
07.02.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
20.12.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.12.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
20.12.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
20.12.2013 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.12.2013 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 4
20.12.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2013 Description Search / examination 13
20.12.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
20.12.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5