Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2806615


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
13.01.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
28.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
02.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
05.02.2016 (Expected) grant published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
08.01.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.12.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.11.2015 Change - extension states published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
31.08.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
07.11.2014 Supplementary search report published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2014 Amendment by applicant
21.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication