Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2806615 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201210323637 EP13805213



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8891755Global Dossier 18.11.2014B2
US2014105380 17.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013CN73398 29.03.2013
CN201210323637 04.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2806615Global Dossier 09.03.2016B1
EP2806615 26.11.2014A4
EP2806615 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013CN73398 29.03.2013
CN201210323637 04.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014036828Global Dossier 13.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
CN201210323637 04.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103685615BGlobal Dossier 21.12.2016B
CN103685615 26.03.2014A
Priority number Date
CN201210323637 04.09.2012