Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2932589

EP2932589 - SWITCH MODE POWER SUPPLY MODULE HAVING A HICCUP MODE AND ITEM OF EQUIPMENT POWERED BY SAID MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/19]
Former [2015/43]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MORIZOT, Gérard
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
02 / MARCHAND, Philippe
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
03 / GUILLOT, Philippe
c/o Technicolor R&D France
975 Avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
F-35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/43]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13805389.716.12.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013EP76654
Priority number, dateFR2012006213017.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262130
[2015/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014095687
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2932589
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/156, H02M3/335, H02M1/00
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:SCHALTNETZTEILMODUL MIT HICCUP-MODUS UND DURCH DIESES MODUL ANGETRIEBENES AUSRÜSTUNGSELEMENT[2015/43]
English:SWITCH MODE POWER SUPPLY MODULE HAVING A HICCUP MODE AND ITEM OF EQUIPMENT POWERED BY SAID MODULE[2015/43]
French:MODULE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE À DÉCOUPAGE COMPRENANT UN MODE HOQUET ET PIÈCE D'ÉQUIPEMENT ALIMENTÉE PAR LEDIT MODULE[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2015National basic fee paid 
04.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
08.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE102005038660  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA [AT]) [X] 2 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figure 5 * [A] 1,3,4;
 [XA]US7030596  (SALERNO DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 2 * column 8, line 12 - line 19 * * column 10, line 21 - line 28 * [A] 1,3,4;
 [A]WO2006120640  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 10 - page 11; figure 4 *