Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2922917

EP2922917 - SELF-EXTINGUISHING POLYMERIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Versalis S.p.A
P.le Boldrini 1
20097 S. Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
[2015/40]
Inventor(s)01 / CASALINI, Alessandro
Via Corrado N. 30
I-46100 Mantova / IT
02 / LONGO, Aldo
Via Enrico Paglia 5
I-46100 Mantova / IT
03 / PONTICIELLO, Antonio
Via Salvo D'Acquisto 4B
37122 Mozzecane (VR) / IT
04 / VANNUCCI, Giuditta
Via Fratelli Cervi 73
I-56022 Castelfranco di Sotto / IT
 [2015/43]
Former [2015/40]01 / CASALINI, Alessandro
Via Corrado N. 30
I-46100 Mantova / IT
02 / LONGO, Aldo
Via Enrico Paglia 5
I-46100 Mantova / IT
03 / PONTICIELLO, Antonio
Via Salvo D'Acquisto 4B
37122 Verona / IT
04 / VANNUCCI, Giuditta
Via Fratelli Cervi 73
I-56022 Castelfranco di Sotto / IT
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/40]Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13805588.415.11.2013
[2015/40]
WO2013IB60157
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0197320.11.2012         Original published format: IT MI20121973
[2015/40]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014080326
Date:30.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2922917
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014
[2015/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2922917
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L25/06, C08L51/04, C08L53/00, C08F212/08, C08F293/00
[2015/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SELBSTLÖSCHENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2015/40]
English:SELF-EXTINGUISHING POLYMERIC COMPOSITION[2015/40]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMÉRIQUE AUTO-EXTINGUIBLE[2015/40]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2015National basic fee paid 
01.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2016Fee for grant paid
28.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2016
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MK04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]CY04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Former [2018/33]DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Former [2018/14]DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]FI04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010041800  (SON SE BUM [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,11 * example 9 * [I] 4,5,7-10,12;
 [A]JP2000103952  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4032481
 EP0066686
 DE3402539
 EP0848727
 WO2011008417
 US2010331497
 EP0960909
 WO2004005361
 US4051199
 US4131725
 US6576692
 US6903164
 WO2008085513
 US7320585
    - XANTHOS M.; DAGLI S.S., POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 31, no. 13, pages 929 - 935
    - AYRES J.T.; MANN C.K., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, PART B: POLYMER LETTERS, (1965), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 505 - 508
    - TOMOI M.; ODA H; KAKIUCHI, MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, (1986), vol. 7, pages 143 - 148
    - "Recommended terminology for the description of carbon as a solid (IUPAC Recommendations", PURE APPL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 473 - 506