Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2928320

EP2928320 - PSEUDO-LOAF FOOD COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2018/44]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2015/42]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / RAYNER, Michael G.
4904 Creek Crossing Dr
St. Joseph, Missouri 64507 / US
02 / RAYNER, Jean, Luz
4904 Creek Crossing Dr
St. Joseph, Missouri 64507 / US
03 / MILLER, Rachel
3626 Hartford St Fl 1
St. Louis, Missouri 63116 / US
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/44]Kingsbury, Oliver William , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2015/42]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13805664.322.11.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013US71497
Priority number, dateUS201261733079P04.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261733079 P
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014088852
Date:12.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2928320
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2928320
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A23K50/48, A23K50/40, A23K10/20
[2018/31]
Former International [2015/42]A23K1/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLEISCHKÄSEARTIGE-NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2018/31]
English:PSEUDO-LOAF FOOD COMPOSITIONS[2015/42]
French:COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES ANALOGUES AU PÂTÉ[2018/31]
Former [2015/42]PSEUDOBROT-NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Former [2015/42]COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES DU TYPE PAIN
Entry into regional phase27.05.2015National basic fee paid 
27.05.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
04.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2018Fee for grant paid
18.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2017
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2019  05.08.2019  ADMISSIBLE
Mars, Incorporated
6885 Elm Street
Mclean, Virginia 22101 / US
Opponent's representative
Cockerton, Bruce Roger
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2019/37]
12.08.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
MT22.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/50]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US6440485  (CHEUK WAI LUN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,10-12,15,18-21 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 52 * * column 6, lines 35-38, 45-46 * * column 7, lines 14, 23-27, 39-50 * * example 2 * [Y] 16-21 [I] 9,13,14
 [XYI]US2009214738  (DIERKING MARK LEE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] - [0017] - [0019] - [0022] - [0023] - [0025] , [0027] , [0033] * * examples 1-2 * [Y] 15-21 [I] 4,5,9,10,13,14
 [Y]US4781939  (MARTIN R CRAIG [US] ET AL) [Y] 15-21 * column 3, lines 4-15 * * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 33 * * column 8, lines 42-48,55-57 * * column 10, lines 1-5 *
 [Y]US6692787  (MAY STEPHEN [US] ET AL) [Y] 15-21 * column 2, lines 1-52 * * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, lines 48-55 *
 [Y]US2007148323  (DINGMAN STEVEN E [US] ET AL) [Y] 15-21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] - [0015] - [0024] - [0026] - [0033] , [0049] , [0057] - [0058] - [0079] *
 [A]US2006141125  (GIFFORD CATRIONA [AU]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] - [0022] - [0029] - [0031] *
 [A]US3965259  (COPPAGE THOMAS B ET AL) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * example 1 *
 US7736686  [ ]
 US6692787  [ ]
 US6379738  [ ]
 US4781939  [ ]
 WO2008085293  [ ]
 WO2012057826  [ ]