Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2863986

EP2863986 - DEVICE AND METHODS FOR NONINVASIVE NEUROMODULATION USING TARGETED TRANSCRANNIAL ELECTRICAL STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thync, Inc.
61 E. Main Street, Suite C
Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / TYLER, William, J.
2503 Creston Avenue
Roanoke, VA 24015 / US
02 / WETMORE, Daniel, Z.
264 Guerrero Street
San Francisco, CA 94103 / US
03 / OPITZ, Alexander
Thiestrasse 15a
37077 Goettingen / DE
04 / SATO, Tomo
1121 1st Street, Apt. 8
Roanoke, VA 24016 / US
05 / PAL, Sumon
255 Massachiusetts Avenue,
Suite C
Boston, MA 02115 / US
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2015/18]
Application number, filing date13806986.921.06.2013
WO2013US47174
Priority number, dateUS201261663409P22.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261663409 P
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013192582
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863986
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/36, A61N1/08, A61B5/04, A61B5/02, G06Q50/22
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR NICHTINVASIVEN NEUROMODULATION MITHILFE GEZIELTER TRANSKRANIALER ELEKTRISCHER STIMULATION[2015/18]
English:DEVICE AND METHODS FOR NONINVASIVE NEUROMODULATION USING TARGETED TRANSCRANNIAL ELECTRICAL STIMULATION[2015/18]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE NEUROMODULATION NON EFFRACTIVE À L'AIDE D'UNE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE CRÂNIENNE CIBLÉE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2014National basic fee paid 
22.12.2014Search fee paid 
22.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/06]
23.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2006138702  (RUSSELL MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-8,13,15 * pages 10-20; claims 57-58,62 * [Y] 9-12,14;
 [Y]WO2010120823  (RES FOUNDATION OF THE CITY UNI [US], et al) [Y] 9-12,14 * pages 21,30-31 *;
 [A]US2004019370  (GLINER BRADFORD EVAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2010120823  (RES FOUNDATION OF THE CITY UNI [US], et al);
 [A]US2010145215  (PRADEEP ANANTHA [US], et al);
 [A]US2011130615  (MISHELEVICH DAVID J [US]);
 [A]US2007179557  (MASCHINO STEVEN E [US], et al);
 [A]US2004059241  (SUFFIN STEPHEN [US]);
 [A]US2007173902  (MASCHINO STEVEN E [US], et al)