Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2864591

EP2864591 - THERMAL OPTICAL FLUID COMPOSITION DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Schlumberger Technology B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89m
2514 JG The Hague / NL
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / BRADY, Dominic
26 Grovelands Road
Winchester Hampshire SO22 5JY / GB
02 / HARTOG, Arthur H.
Meadow Cottage
Martyr Worthy
Winchester Hampshire SO21 1DZ / GB
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/35]Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Former [2015/18]Ford, Michael Frederick
IP Law Dept
Schlumberger Gould Research
High Cross
Madingley Road
Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB
Application number, filing date13807176.604.06.2013
[2017/35]
WO2013US43964
Priority number, dateUS20121352839520.06.2012         Original published format: US201213528395
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013191886
Date:27.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2864591
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2864591
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/08, E21B47/00, E21B47/10, E21B47/06, G01N33/28
[2016/16]
Former International [2015/18]E21B49/08, E21B47/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS EINER THERMISCHEN OPTISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2015/18]
English:THERMAL OPTICAL FLUID COMPOSITION DETECTION[2015/18]
French:DÉTECTION OPTIQUE THERMIQUE DE COMPOSITION FLUIDIQUE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2014National basic fee paid 
04.10.2014Search fee paid 
04.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
24.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2017Fee for grant paid
24.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2016
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.01.2017Request for further processing filed
09.01.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.01.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/40]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004252748  (GLEITMAN DANIEL D [US]) [X] 1,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0044] , [ 0057] , [ 0086] , [ 0089]; figures 1-9 * [I] 2-9,11,13;
 [Y]EP0144630  (LUXTRON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 10; figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]US2006010973  (BROWN GEORGE A [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] - [ 0062] - [0064]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]US2011320147  (BRADY DOMINIC [GB] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0041] , [ 0050] - [0052]; figures 1-5 *
International search[A]US2006214098  (RAMOS ROGERIO [GB]);
 [A]US2009199630  (DIFOGGIO ROCCO [US], et al);
 [A]US2011249266  (KUMAR SUNIL [DE]);
 [A]US2011284219  (POMERANTZ ANDREW E [US], et al);
 [A]US2012132417  (DRIA DENNIS EDWARD [US], et al)
by applicantUS2004252748