EP2865791 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BODY, AND POROUS CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BODY PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JNC Corporation 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8105 / JP | For all designated states SofSera Corporation Elpulimento Shinjuku 3F 6-7-1-314, Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGAI, Yasumichi c/o SofSera Corporation 314 6-7-1 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | 02 /
NOMI, Daisuke c/o SofSera Corporation 314 6-7-1 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Hisashi c/o SofSera Corporation 314 6-7-1 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | 04 /
KAWABE, Karl Kazushige c/o SofSera Corporation 314 6-7-1 Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0022 / JP | 05 /
UMEBAYASHI, You c/o JNC FIBERS CORPORATION FIBER RESEARCH CENTER 230 Kawatacho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-0001 / JP | 06 /
KATAOKA, Yukinori c/o JNC FIBERS CORPORATION FIBER RESEARCH CENTER 230 Kawatacho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-0001 / JP | 07 /
MIYAUCHI, Minoru c/o JNC FIBERS CORPORATION FIBER RESEARCH CENTER 230 Kawatacho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524-0001 / JP | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Thurston, Joanna Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13807515.5 | 19.06.2013 | WO2013JP66883 | Priority number, date | JP20120139147 | 20.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012139147 | JP20120226291 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012226291 | [2015/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013191221 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865791 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/32, D01D5/00, D01F9/08 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
D01F9/08 (EP,US);
C01B25/327 (KR);
C01B25/32 (EP,US);
C01B25/321 (EP,US);
D01D5/0007 (US);
D01D5/0015 (US);
D01D5/0023 (US);
D01D5/003 (EP,US);
D01D5/0038 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | D01F9/08, C01B25/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PORÖSEN CALCIUMPHOSPHATKÖRPERS UND IN DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER PORÖSER CALCIUMPHOSPHATKÖRPER | [2015/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POROUS CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BODY, AND POROUS CALCIUM PHOSPHATE BODY PRODUCED THEREBY | [2015/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS EN PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM POREUX ET CORPS EN PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM POREUX PRODUIT PAR CE PROCÉDÉ | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | Translation filed | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 11.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0174827 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 9 * page 5, line 9 - page 8, line 4 * * page 10, line 1111 - page 11, line 7 * * page 13, line 9 - page 15, line 10 * * page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 13 * * page 19, line 24 - page 20, line 14 * [I] 1-8 | [X] - DAI ET AL, "Electrospinning of hydroxyapatite fibrous mats", MATERIALS LETTERS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070421), vol. 61, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.MATLET.2006.07.195, ISSN 0167-577X, pages 2735 - 2738, XP022041072 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * *page 2737, "4. Conclusions"* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matlet.2006.07.195 | [X] - SATYA SHIVKUMAR ET AL, "Production of Novel Architectures Through Controlled Degradation of Electrospun Precursors", ADVANCED PROCESSING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGIES FOR STRUCTURAL AND MULTIFUNCTIONAL MATERIALS III - A COLLECTION OF PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE 33RD INT. CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED CERAMICS AND COMPOSITES; 20090118 TO 20090123; DAYTONA BEACH, FL, USAIN: C, Hoboken, NJ, USA, (20100101), vol. 30, no. 8, doi:10.1002/9780470584392.ch18, ISBN 978-0-470-45758-0, pages 145 - 156, XP055239732 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470584392.ch18 | [XA] - PENG F ET AL, "Hydroxyapatite needle-shaped particles/poly(l -lactic acid) electrospun scaffolds with perfect particle-along-nanofiber orientation and significantly enhanced mechanical properties", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C 20110818 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20110818), vol. 115E, no. 32, doi:10.1021/JP201384Q, pages 15743 - 15751, XP002752798 [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * abstract * *"2.1. Synthesis of HA particles; 2.2. Characterization of HA particles; 2.3. Electrospinning PLLA and HA/PLLA scaffolds"* [A] 4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JP201384Q | [XA] - RODRIGUEZ G N P ET AL, "Electrospun scaffolds composed of Poly(L-lactic acid) and hydroxyapatite", KEY ENGINEERING MATERIALS - BIOCERAMICS 23 2012 TRANS TECH PUBLICATIONS LTD CHE, (20111106), vol. 493-494, doi:10.4028/WWW.SCIENTIFIC.NET/KEM.493-494.872, pages 872 - 877, XP002752799 [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * the whole document * [A] 4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/WWW.SCIENTIFIC.NET/KEM.493-494.872 | [XA] - PHIPPS M C ET AL, "Increasing the pore sizes of bone-mimetic electrospun scaffolds comprised of polycaprolactone, collagen I and hydroxyapatite to enhance cell infiltration", BIOMATERIALS JANUARY 2012 ELSEVIER LTD GBR, (201201), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.09.080, pages 524 - 534, XP002752800 [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * abstract * *page 525, "2.1. Preparation of electrospun scaffolds"* [A] 4,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2011.09.080 | International search | [Y]JPH0585666B (TONEN CORP); | [Y]JP2010189798 (TEIJIN LTD); | [Y]JP2007246299 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY, et al) | by applicant | JPH02167868 | JP2004049355 | JP4265946B |