Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3041634

EP3041634 - MOVEMENT DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR CUTTING TORCHES OF THE PLASMA TYPE AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FICEP S.P.A.
Via Matteotti 21
21045 Gazzada Schianno (VA) / IT
For all designated states
Güdel Group AG
Gaswerkstrasse 26
4900 Langenthal / CH
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / FONGARO, Stefano
Via Brughiera 22/A
I-21040 Castronno / IT
02 / ZULAUF, Walter
Via Oberdorf 91
CH-4937 Ursenbach / CH
03 / COLOMBO, Christian
Piazza dei Volontari 4
I-20145 Milano / IT
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/28]
Application number, filing date13808239.105.09.2013
[2016/28]
WO2013IT00234
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015033360
Date:12.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3041634
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015
[2016/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/013, B23K7/00, B23K10/00, B23K37/02, B23K7/10
[2016/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/28]
TitleGerman:BEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR SCHNEIDBRENNER FÜR PLASMA UND ÄHNLICHES[2016/28]
English:MOVEMENT DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR CUTTING TORCHES OF THE PLASMA TYPE AND THE LIKE[2016/28]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MOUVEMENT, EN PARTICULIER POUR CHALUMEAUX DE COUPE DU TYPE À PLASMA, ET ANALOGUES[2016/28]
Entry into regional phase01.04.2016National basic fee paid 
01.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/28]
22.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
17.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2013041404  (FICEP SPA [IT]; GUEDEL A G [CH]; FONGARO STEFANO [IT]; ZULAUF WALTER [) [ID] 1-9 * page 5 - page 9; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE2403504  (VOLLMAR PAUL) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1428625  (FEIN C & E GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3901098  (JINKINS DANNY R) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2517910  (MILLER ROBERT R) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *