Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2014092561

WO2014092561 - GENE AND METHOD FOR INCREASING DISEASE RESISTANCE IN PERENNIAL PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inova Fruit B.V.
Deilseweg 7
4191 NX Geldermalsen / NL
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOUTEN, Hendrik Jacob
Bosweg 13
NL-6721 HM Bennekom / NL
[N/P]
Application number, filing date13808261.505.12.2013
WO2013NL50874
Priority number, dateEP2012019636310.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12196363
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014092561
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/08, C07K14/415, C12N15/82
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleEnglish:GENE AND METHOD FOR INCREASING DISEASE RESISTANCE IN PERENNIAL PLANTS
French:GÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA RÉSISTANCE AUX MALADIES CHEZ LES PLANTES VIVACES
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/20]
11.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
16.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2016/20]
Public notificationsNoting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 1205A dated 14/09/2015)
Inova Fruit B.V.
Deilseweg 7
4191 NX Geldermalsen / NL
[2015/51]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XDY]  - PAOLO GALLI ET AL, "The Rvi15 ( Vr2 ) Apple Scab Resistance Locus Contains Three TIR-NBS-LRR Genes", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (20100501), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1094/MPMI-23-5-0608, ISSN 0894-0282, pages 608 - 617, XP055063110 [XD] 13-15 * abstract; pages 608, 609, 611, 612, 614; Figure 3 * [Y] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/MPMI-23-5-0608
 [YD]  - JOSHI, S.G. ET AL., "Functional analysis and expression profiling of HcrVf1 and HcrVf2 for development of scab resistant cisgenic and intragenic apples", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 579 - 591, XP002697139 [YD] 1-12 * abstract; Figure 1; Table 3; pages 579, 580 and 587 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-011-9749-1
 [A]  - KELLERHALS M ET AL, "Pyramidisieren von Schorfresistenzen in der Apfelzà  1/4 chtung", ERWERBS-OBSTBAU, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090203), vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 1439-0302, pages 21 - 28, XP019666964 [A] 1-15 * abstract; page 23; Table 1 *
 [A]  - SORIANO J M ET AL, "Identification and mapping of the novel apple scab resistance gene Vd3", TREE GENETICS & GENOMES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090226), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 1614-2950, pages 475 - 482, XP019691339 [A] 1-15 * page 480 *
 [A]  - BROGGINI, G.A.L. ET AL., "Cisgenic approach for improved disease resistance in apple", SECOND GENETICALLY MODIFIED ORGANISMS IN HORTICULTURE SYPMOSIUM, WHITE RIVER (SOUTH AFRICA), (20110911), pages 117 - 121, XP009169087 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.17660/ActaHortic.2013.974.13
 [A]  - THALIA VANBLAERE ET AL, "The development of a cisgenic apple plant", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 154, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JBIOTEC.2011.05.013, ISSN 0168-1656, (20110525), pages 304 - 311, (20110601), XP028240768 [A] 1-15 * abstract; pages 304-306; Figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2011.05.013