Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2873798

EP2873798 - BLIND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oiles Eco Corporation
21-1, Nishi-Gotanda 7-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
[2015/21]
Inventor(s)01 / OHISHI, Mamoru
c/o OILES ECO CORPORATION Omi Plant
33-1 Wakamiya-cho
Omihachiman-shi Shiga 523-0034 / JP
 [2015/21]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/21]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date13808686.313.02.2013
WO2013JP00768
Priority number, dateJP2012014615528.06.2012         Original published format: JP 2012146155
[2015/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014002326
Date:03.01.2014
Language:JA
[2014/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2873798
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/322, E06B9/02, E06B9/302, E06B9/06, E06B9/32
[2016/12]
Former International [2015/21]E06B9/322, E06B9/02, E06B9/302
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
TitleGerman:BLENDENVORRICHTUNG[2015/21]
English:BLIND APPARATUS[2015/21]
French:APPAREIL DE STORE VÉNITIEN[2015/21]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2014Translation filed 
05.12.2014National basic fee paid 
05.12.2014Search fee paid 
05.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/21]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/02]
23.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JP4604670B  (OILES ECO CORP) [A] 1-15 * figures 3,4,13-21 *;
 [A]EP2180132  (OILES ECO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 17,18,19 *
International search[A]JP4604670B  (OILES ECO CORP.);
 [A]WO2009022370  (OILES ECO CORP.)
by applicantJP2004156289
 JP2007239309