EP2867484 - POLYGENERATION PRODUCTION OF POWER AND FERTILIZER THROUGH EMISSIONS CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grannus, LLC 4073 E. Wading Duck Court Tucson, AZ 85712 / US | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERRITT, James Kelly 11191 Coal Mine St Firestone, CO 80504 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2015/19] | 01 /
MERRITT, James, Kelly 2031 Stanford Park Court Katy, Texas 77450 / US | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | Gunning, Jack Peter, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/19] | Sessford, Russell Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13810420.3 | 21.06.2013 | [2020/07] | WO2013IB02045 | Priority number, date | US201261665069P | 27.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665069 P | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014001917 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2867484 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867484 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/00, C01B21/00, C01B3/02, C01C1/04, C07C273/04 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
C01B3/025 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (US);
B01D53/002 (US);
B01D53/1431 (US);
B01D53/1475 (US);
C01B3/042 (US);
C01B3/36 (EP,US);
C01B3/583 (US);
C01B3/586 (US);
C01C1/0488 (EP,US);
C07C273/10 (EP,US);
F23J15/02 (US);
C01B2203/025 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0415 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0445 (US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0495 (US);
C01B2203/068 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1235 (US);
C01B2203/147 (EP,US);
F23J2219/70 (US);
Y02E20/32 (EP);
Y02E20/34 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (US);
Y02P30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | F01N3/00, C01B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYVALENTE ERZEUGUNG VON ENERGIE UND DÜNGER DURCH EMISSIONSERFASSUNG | [2015/19] | English: | POLYGENERATION PRODUCTION OF POWER AND FERTILIZER THROUGH EMISSIONS CAPTURE | [2015/19] | French: | PRODUCTION PAR GÉNÉRATION MULTIPLE D'ÉNERGIE ET D'ENGRAIS AU MOYEN D'UNE CAPTURE D'ÉMISSIONS | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2018 | 06.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2020
18.11.2020
ADMISSIBLE CASALE SA Via Giulio Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano / CH Opponent's representative M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.11.2020
18.11.2020
ADMISSIBLE CASALE SA Via Giulio Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano / CH Opponent's representative M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | 27.11.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.05.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2022 | 06.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.11.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | IE | 21.06.2020 | LU | 21.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | GB | 21.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/22] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MK | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MK | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 21.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 21.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03027062 (RENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 21; figures 1,3a,3b ** page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 13 *; | [I]US2004028595 (DAVEY WILLIAM [DE], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]GB1104628 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [Y]US4671893 (PINTO ALWYN [GB]); | [Y]US5076837 (RATHBONE THOMAS [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2009079681 (DONNELLY JAMES [AU]); | [A]US2010107607 (KOPP ANDRE [DE]); | [Y]US2010132259 (HAQUE ISRAR UL [US]); | [Y]WO2011008900 (LIVEFUELS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3736745 | US4434613 | US4498289 | WO9105946 | US5175995 | US5247791 | US5265410 | US5715673 | US5802840 | US5956937 | US6314896 | US8268896 | - ENERGY CONVERSION & MANAGEMENT, (19921105), vol. 33, page 467 | - YANTOVSKII, PROCEEDINGS OF WORLD CLEAN ENERGY CONFERENCE, (19910000), pages 571 - 595 | Opposition | US4671893 | US4725380 | US5736116 | DE10232970 | US2004028595 | EP1698588 | US2009064582 | EP2186778 | EP2199254 | WO2012177137 | - Ratnasamy C; Wagner J, "Water Gas shift Catalysis", Catalysis Reviews, (20090000), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 325 - 440, XP008124903 | - Jozef H. Meessen, Harro Petersen, "Urea", Ullmann’s Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Vol. A 27, Weinheim, VCH Verlagsgesellschaft, (1996), pages 333 - 363, XP055756338 | - Max Appl, "Ammonia, 3. Production Plants", Wiley-VCH Verlag, Weinheim, (2012), vol. Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, pages 228 - 261, XP055056405 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.o02_o12 |