Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936524

EP2936524 - AN OPTO-ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swansea University
School of Engineering
Singleton Park
Swansea SA2 8PP / GB
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / WIJDEKOP, Maarten
11 Almond Way
Hope
Wrexham LL12 9NZ / GB
02 / McGETTRICK, James Douglas
23 Oakwood Road
Brynmill
Swansea, West Glamorgan SA2 0DN / GB
03 / MELGARI, Paolo
19 Dryburn Hill
Durham, County Durham DH1 5AE / GB
04 / HAMMOND, Deborah
Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V.
Group Intellectual Property Services 3G.37
Wenckebachstraat 1
NL-1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL
05 / KETIPEARACHCHI, Udaya S.
Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V.
Group Intellectual Property Services 3G.37
Wenckebachstraat 1
NL-1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL
06 / GREENWOOD, Peter Clarke
10 Dalrymple Street
Aberavon
Port Talbot, Neath-Port Talbot SA12 6DY / GB
07 / BRYANT, Daniel Thomas James
18 Ruston Road
Port Talbot
Swansea SA1 8DE / GB
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie , et al
Symbiosis IP Limited
Cardiff MediCentre
Heath Park
Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date13810897.218.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013EP03840
Priority number, dateEP2012000843919.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12008439
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014095060
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936524
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01G9/20, H01L51/42, H01L51/44
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:OPTOELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2015/44]
English:AN OPTO-ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2015/44]
French:DISPOSITIF OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2015National basic fee paid 
17.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
08.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
06.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201503   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2005158727  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0052] , [0056] , [0089] , [0099] , [0100] , [0104] , [0115] , [0116] , [0117] , [0125] *;
 [XI]WO2011009631  (CORUS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,11,12,15 * page 15, line 12 - page 16, line 19; figure 2 * * page 6, line 1 - line 2 * * page 6, line 23 - line 24 * [I] 2;
 [XD]WO2010107795  (KONARKA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,7-10 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 2 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 9; figure 1 * * page 9, line 21 - line 31 *;
 [Y]US2011220170  (OBONAI NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7,11,12 * paragraph [0232] - paragraph [0237]; example 1 * * paragraphs [0052] , [0058] - paragraph [0060] *;
 [Y]WO9966520  (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [Y] 1-7,11,12 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 23 *;
 [A]JPS613472  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 2 * page 335, column 1, line 30 - line 36 *;
 [A]EP1786047  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *
by applicantWO2010107795
    - PROF MICHAEL GRÄTZEL, NATURE, vol. 353, no. 24, pages 737 - 740