Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2921033

EP2921033 - METHOD FOR CONFIGURING LIGHT SOURCES IN A SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lighting Fundamentals IP BV
Gijsbrecht van Amstelstraat 328a
1215 CV Hilversum / NL
[2015/39]
Inventor(s)01 / TIMMER, Robert Jaap
Gijsbrecht van Amstelstraat 328a
NL-1215 CV Hilversum / NL
02 / DALDEROP, Jeroen
Gijsbrecht van Amstelstraat 328a
NL-1215 CV Hilversum / NL
 [2015/39]
Representative(s)van Heuvel, Margaretha
Dogio Patents
P.O. Box 2350
1200 CJ Hilversum / NL
[2015/39]
Application number, filing date13811265.112.11.2013
[2015/39]
WO2013NL50812
Priority number, dateNL2012103989112.11.2012         Original published format: NL 1039891
[2015/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2014073972
Date:15.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2921033
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/02
[2015/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN LICHTQUELLEN IN EINEM RAUM[2015/39]
English:METHOD FOR CONFIGURING LIGHT SOURCES IN A SPACE[2015/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE SOURCES DE LUMIÈRE DANS UN ESPACE[2015/39]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2015National basic fee paid 
12.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
17.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/24]
10.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US7139617  (MORGAN FREDERICK M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]US5406176  (SUGDEN WALTER H [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]US5629587  (GRAY ROGER M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [XAI]  - User Manual, "Martin ShowDesigner", Denmark, (20110128), pages 1 - 310, URL: http://www.lighthouse.nl/manuals/msd5/MSDUserManual.pdf, (20130627), XP055068514 [X] 1-5,8,9 * pages 2-4,16 * * pages 19-133 * [A] 6,7 [I] 10-15
 [A]  - User Guide, "ColorPlay 3 Version 1.11", Eindhoven, Netherlands, (2011), pages 1 - 110, URL: http://www.colorkinetics.com/support/userGuides/ColorPlay_3_User_Guide.pdf, (20130627), XP055068518 [A] 1-5,8,9 * pages 3-34 * * pages 81-95 *
 [A]  - "Martin Professional Offers iPhone MAXRemote", Aarhus, Denmark, (20090412), page 1, URL: http://www.martin.com/productnews/productnews.asp?id=444, (20130627), XP055068604 [A] 1 * the whole document *