Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2932206

EP2932206 - PUMP PROVIDED WITH AN ASSEMBLY FOR MEASURING THE TEMPERATURE OR FLOW RATE OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Eveon
345 rue Lavoisier Zirst 2, Innovallée
38330 Montbonnot Saint Martin / FR
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NICOLAS, Stephane
1 allée des Tonnelles
F-38240 Meylan / FR
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Colombo, Michel
Brevinnov
310 avenue Berthelot
69008 Lyon / FR
[2019/13]
Former [2015/43]Colombo, Michel
GIE Innovation Competence Group
310 bis aveue Berthelot
69008 Lyon / FR
Application number, filing date13811844.311.12.2013
[2015/43]
WO2013EP76282
Priority number, dateFR2012006205014.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262050
[2015/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014090900
Date:19.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2932206
Date:21.10.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2015/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2932206
Date:27.03.2019
Language:FR
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:F04B43/02, F04B53/10, G01F1/05, G01K13/02, G01F1/684, F04B19/00, F04B43/04, G01F1/692, F04B53/16
[2018/43]
Former International [2015/43]G01F1/684, F04B19/00, F04B43/04, G01F1/692
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PUMPE MIT EINER ANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER TEMPERATUR ODER DER DURCHFLUSSRATE EINES FLUIDS[2015/43]
English:PUMP PROVIDED WITH AN ASSEMBLY FOR MEASURING THE TEMPERATURE OR FLOW RATE OF A FLUID[2015/43]
French:POMPE EQUIPEE D'UN ENSEMBLE DE MESURE DE LA TEMPERATURE OU DU DEBIT D'UN FLUIDE[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2015National basic fee paid 
15.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
18.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2019Fee for grant paid
15.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.03.2019
AT27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
PL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
SM27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
IS27.07.2019
PT27.07.2019
[2020/04]
Former [2020/03]AL27.03.2019
AT27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
PL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
SM27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
PL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
SM27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/51]AL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
SM27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL27.03.2019
CZ27.03.2019
EE27.03.2019
ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RO27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
SK27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
PT27.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE102005058080  (UNIV ALBERT LUDWIGS FREIBURG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]WO0242723  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]; ARTMANN HANS [DE]; PANNEK THORSTEN [DE]; KONZE) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]US7255001  (DAVIS RICHARD A [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]DE10161202  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]US6527835  (MANGINELL RONALD P [US] ET AL) [Y] 4 * the whole document *
 [YD]WO2011133014  (MIMOS BERHAD [MY]; LEE HING WAH [MY]; DANIEL BIEN CHIA SHENG [MY]; MOH) [YD] 9-15 * the whole document *