Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2935365

EP2935365 - PROCESS FOR COPOLYMERIZING ETHYLENE AND ESTERS OF VINYL ALCOHOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FINETTE, Andre-Armand
Sperberweg 20
50997 Köln / DE
02 / WOLF, Christoph
Liethenstrasse 152
50259 Pulheim-Dansweiler / DE
03 / KHAYRULLIN, Danir
Geildorfer Bach 30
50321 Bruehl / DE
04 / MEI, Giulia
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
p.le Donegani
12
I-44100 Ferrara / IT
05 / MOHRBUTTER, Juergen
Am Wurmerich 5
53347 Alfter / DE
06 / LITTMANN, Dieter
Auf dem Stein 19
35325 Mücke / DE
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan , et al
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date13811866.616.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013EP76683
Priority number, dateEP2012019835020.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12198350
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014095708
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2935365
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2935365
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/02, C08F2/00, C07C67/54
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR COPOLYMERISIERUNG VON ETHYLEN UND ESTERN VON VINYLALKOHOL[2017/37]
English:PROCESS FOR COPOLYMERIZING ETHYLENE AND ESTERS OF VINYL ALCOHOL[2015/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COPOLYMÉRISATION D'ÉTHYLÈNE ET D'ESTERS D'ALCOOL VINYLIQUE[2015/44]
Former [2015/44]VERFAHREN ZUR COPOLYMERISIERUNG VON ETHYLEN UND ESTERN AUS VINYLALKOHOL
Entry into regional phase22.06.2015National basic fee paid 
22.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
25.06.2015Observations by third parties
19.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2017Fee for grant paid
09.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.10.2018  18.10.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Mikulecky, Klaus
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Patent & License Management Chemicals
Industriepark Höchst, G 860
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  16.10.2018   
Lunati, Valerio
Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.l.
Via Carlo Pisacane, 36
20129 Milano (MI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L.
Via Carlo Pisacane, 36
20129 Milano / IT
 03  16.10.2018   
Versalis S.p.A.
Piazza Boldrini, 1
20097 San Donato Milanese / IT
Opponent's representative
Marturano, Pasqualino
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
 [2018/47]
31.10.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.03.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
IE16.12.2018
LU16.12.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/40]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
LU16.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
LU16.12.2018
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2012084772  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 25 - line 32 * * claim - * [Y] 1-10;
 [X]US2005037219  (OHLSSON STEFAN BERTIL [BE], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 23,24,38 * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [Y]WO2008019873  (CELANESE CHEM EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [AD]EP0012368  (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [AD]WO9914251  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [XP]WO2013052264  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [XP] 1 * claim - *
by applicantUS4091200
 EP0012368
 WO9914251
    - "Standard Test Method for Determination of the Vinyl Acetate Content of Ethylene-Vinyl Acetate (EVA) Copolymers by Fourier Transform Infrared Spectroscopy (FT-IR", ASTM: D5594 - 98 (REAPPROVED 2004
OppositionKR20030085833
 WO8201548
 DE2802866
 DD292465
 DD260399
 WO2012084772
 US3404177
 US4379940
 WO2012084772  * Pages 1, 2, 3, 6, 7 *
 WO2010081684  * Pages 2, 3, 7, 8 *
    - ., ".", Ullmann's Encyclopedia ''Polyolefins", Wiley-VCH Verlag, (20050000), pages 1 - 103
    - Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, 19. auflage, (19970000), pages P30 - P31, XP055524829
    - M.L. FRENKEL, Kolbenverdichter - Theorie, Konstruktion und Projektierung, VEB Verlag Technik Berlin, (19690000), pages 71 - 73, 102-104, XP055524831
    - "Reference Document on Best Available Techniques in the Production of Polymers", (20070800), pages 36 - 44
    - N.R. VAGHELA et al., "Heavy Oil Removal Process from Vinyl acetate", International Journal of ChemTech Research, (20110700), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 1359 - 1361, XP055184864
    - "ETHYLENE-VINYL ACETATE COPOLYMERS", Progress Economic Program Report No. 155A, (19920100), pages pp, 6.1 - 6.4, pp, XP055524843
    - "ETHYLENE-VINYL ACETATE COPOLYMERS", Progress Economic Program Report No. 155A, (19920100), pages pp, 7.1 - 7.5, F.5, XP055524847
    - Vaghela et al., "Heavy Oil Removal Process from Vinyl Acetate", International Journal of ChemTech Research, (20110700), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 1359 - 1361, XP055184864
    - "Dessiccant Performance Data", Data sheet Süd Chemie, (20110000), XP055524848
    - Dossier de Demande d'Autorisation d'Exploiter - PE L51 - Partie 3 - Nature et volume de l'activité, (20080700), pages 20 - 31, XP055524858
    - VICTOR WAN, "Ethylene-vinyl acetate copolymers", Ethylene-vinyl acetate copolymersProcess Economics Program Report 155B, (20120900), pages 1.1, 2.6, 2.8, 2.9, 5.1, 5.4, 5.7, 5.10, 5.13, 6.1 - 6.6, 7.1-7.6, E.3, E.5, XP055524880
    - "Polyethylene", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (19980000), pages 1 - 34, 120, XP003034193
    - G. LUFT, Decompositions in LDPE plants. Part III - Influence of Impurities, (20010000), page 51, XP055524894