Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2929024

EP2929024 - BETA-HEXOSYL-TRANSFERASES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
North Carolina State University
Campus Box 8210
Raleigh, NC 27695 / US
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / BRUNO-BARCENA, Jose, M.
920 Main Campus Drive. Suite 400
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
02 / DAGHER, Suzanne
920 Main Campus Dr. Suite 400
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
03 / AZCARATE-PERIL, Maria, Andrea
920 Main Campus Dr. Suite 400
Raleigh, NC 27606 / US
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/22]
Former [2015/42]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13812374.009.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013US73870
Priority number, dateUS201261734742P07.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261734742 P
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014089558
Date:12.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2929024
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2929024
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/10, A23C9/12, A23G9/34, A23L29/00, C07K14/39
[2018/30]
Former International [2015/42]C12N9/24, A23L1/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BETA-HEXOSYL-TRANSFERASEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN[2018/30]
English:BETA-HEXOSYL-TRANSFERASES AND USES THEREOF[2015/42]
French:BETA-HEXOSYLTRANSFERASES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2018/30]
Former [2015/42]BETA-HEXOSYL-TRANSFERASEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON
Former [2015/42]BÊTA-HEXOSYLTRANSFÉRASES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS
Entry into regional phase02.07.2015National basic fee paid 
02.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2019Fee for grant paid
17.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
BG29.08.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL29.05.2019
FI29.05.2019
HR29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
LV29.05.2019
RS29.05.2019
GR30.08.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
PT30.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI29.05.2019
LT29.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[XP]  - S. F. DAGHER ET AL, "Heterologous Expression of a Bioactive -Hexosyltransferase, an Enzyme Producer of Prebiotics, from Sporobolomyces singularis", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20130215), vol. 79, no. 4, doi:10.1128/AEM.03491-12, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 1241 - 1249, XP055100432 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.03491-12
 [YD]  - ISHIKAWA E ET AL, "Identification, cloning, and characterization of a Sporobolomyces singularis beta-galactosidase-like enzyme involved in galacto-oligosaccharide production", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 99, no. 4, ISSN 1389-1723, (20050401), pages 331 - 339, (20050401), XP027707170 [YD] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DALY R ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF HETEROLOGOUS PROTEINS IN PICHIA PASTORIS: A USEFUL EXPERIMENTAL TOOL IN PROTEIN ENGINEERING AND PRODUCTION", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, HEYDEN & SON LTD., LONDON, GB, (20050301), vol. 18, no. 2, doi:10.1002/JMR.687, ISSN 0952-3499, pages 119 - 138, XP009059265 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmr.687
 [Y]  - YOUN-JEUNG CHO ET AL, "Purification and biochemical properties of a galactooligosaccharide producing [beta]-galactosidase from Bullera singularis", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20031201), vol. 25, no. 24, doi:10.1023/B:BILE.0000007077.58019.bb, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 2107 - 2111, XP055100697 [Y] 20-22 * the whole document * * page 2107, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:BILE.0000007077.58019.bb
 [A]  - LEONARDO M DAMASCENO ET AL, "Protein secretion inand advances in protein production", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20111106), vol. 93, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00253-011-3654-Z, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 31 - 39, XP019997883 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-011-3654-z
by applicantUS4965195
 EP0367566
 US4968607
 EP0460846
 US5011912
 WO9118982
 US5654176
 US7595198
    - MAYER ET AL., "Research for creation of functional foods with Bifidobacteria", ACTA ALIMENTARIA, (2003), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1556/AAlim.32.2003.1.5, pages 27 - 39, XP009036222

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1556/AAlim.32.2003.1.5
    - GIBSON GR; ROBERFROID MB., "Dietary Modulation of the Human Colonic Microbiota - Introducing the Concept of Prebiotics", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1995), vol. 125, pages 1401 - 12, XP000972244
    - NIELSEN ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1997), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 1 - 6
    - VON HEIJNE, EUR J BIOCHEM, (1983), vol. 133, no. 1, pages 7 - 21
    - VON HEIJNE, J MOL BIOL, (1985), vol. 184, pages 99 - 105
    - COSMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 768 - 771
    - KNOL ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 27, no. 26, pages 15358 - 15366
    - HOPP ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1204
    - SASSENFELD, TIBTECH, (1990), vol. 8, pages 88 - 93
    - BREWER ET AL., Purification and Analysis of Recombinant Proteins, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1991), pages 239 - 266
    - BREWER; SASSENFELD, Protein Purification Applications, PRESS, INC., (1990), pages 91 - 111
    - LUCKOW; SUMMERS, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 47 - 55
    - GLUZMAN ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 23, pages 175 - 182
    - PUCK ET AL., PNAS USA, (1958), vol. 60, pages 1275 - 1281
    - FISCHER ET AL., INT J CANCER, (1970), vol. 5, pages 21 - 27
    - BRAKE, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 13, pages 269 - 280
    - MCMAHAN ET AL., EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 2821 - 2832
    - OKAYAMA; BERG, MOL CELL BIOL, (1982), vol. 2, pages 161 - 170
    - COSMAN ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (1986), vol. 23, pages 935 - 941
    - SIGMA-ALDRICH, HOPP ET AL., NAT BIOTECH, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1204 - 1210
    - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767
    - CHONG ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 192, no. 2, pages 271 - 281
    - GENTZ ET AL., PNAS USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 821 - 824
    - GANZLE,M.G.; HAASE,G.; JELEN,P., "Lactose: Crystallization, hydrolysis and value-added derivatives", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.idairyj.2008.03.003, pages 685 - 694, XP022701022

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.idairyj.2008.03.003
    - AFFERTSHOLT-ALLEN T., "Market developments and industry challenges for lactose and lactose derivatives. IDF Symposium", LACTOSE AND ITS DERIVATIVES, (2007), URL: lactose. ru/present/1Tage_Affertsholt-Allen. pdf
    - SMITHERS, G.W., "Whey and whey proteins", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1016/j.idairyj.2008.03.008, pages 695 - 704, XP022701023

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.idairyj.2008.03.008
    - BACH, HORACIO ET AL., "Escherichia coli maltose-binding protein as a molecular chaperone for recombinant intracellular cytoplasmic single-chain antibodies", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 312.1, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.2001.4914, pages 79 - 93, XP004466120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2001.4914
    - BOYD, DANA; JON BECKWITH, "The role of charged amino acids in the localization of secreted and membrane proteins", CELL, (1990), vol. 62.6, pages 1031 - 33
    - CEREGHINO, J. L.; J. M. CREGG, "Heterologous protein expression in the methylotrophic yeast Pichia pastoris", FEMS MICROBIOL.REV., (2000), vol. 24.1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-6445(99)00029-7, pages 45 - 66, XP002261542

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-6445(99)00029-7
    - DAMASCENO; LEONARDO, CHUNG JR HUANG; CARL BATT., "Protein secretion in Pichia pastoris and advances in protein production", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 93.1, pages 31 - 39
    - GRAGE, KATRIN; BERND H. A. REHM, "In Vivo Production of scFv-Displaying Biopolymer Beads Using a Self-Assembly-Promoting Fusion Partner", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 19.1, pages 254 - 62
    - KURJAN, JANET; IRA HERSKOWITZ, "Structure of a yeast pheromone gene (MFa): A putative a-factor precursor contains four tandem copies of mature a-factor.", CELL, (1982), vol. 30.3, pages 933 - 43
    - MARTINEAU; PIERRE; PETER JONES; GREG WINTER, "Expression of an antibody fragment at high levels in the bacterial cytoplasm", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 280.1, pages 117 - 27
    - PANESAR, PARMJIT S. ET AL., "Microbial production, immobilization and applications of B-D-galactosidase", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 81.4, pages 530 - 43
    - SEARS, P.; C. H. WONG, "Toward automated synthesis of oligosaccharides and glycoproteins", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 291.5512, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1058899, pages 2344 - 50, XP002273571

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1058899
    - SPENCER, J. F. T.; A. L. R. DE SPENCER; C. LALUCE, "Non-conventional yeasts", APPL.MICROBIOL.BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 58.2, doi:doi:10.1007/s00253-001-0834-2, pages 147 - 56, XP055351995

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-001-0834-2
    - "Galacto-Oligosaccharide Prebiotics", TZORTZIS, GEORGE; JELENA VULEVIC, Prebiotics and Probiotics Science and Technology, SPRINGER, (2009), pages 207 - 44
    - VISINTIN, MICHELA ET AL., "Selection of antibodies for intracellular function using a two-hybrid in vivo system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1999), vol. 96.21, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.96.21.11723, pages 11723 - 28, XP002143442

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.21.11723
    - VON HEIJNE, GUNNAR, "Patterns of Amino Acids near Signal-Sequence Cleavage Sites", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1983), vol. 133.1, pages 17 - 21, XP001316578
    - BLAKELY, J. A.; S. L. MACKENZI, "Purification and properties of a b-hexosidase from Sporobolomyces singularis.", CAN. J. BIOCHEM., (1969), vol. 47, pages 1021 - 1025
    - BOEHM, G.; J. JELINEK; B. STAHL; K. VAN LAERE, J. KNOL; S. FANARO; G. MORO; V. VIGI., "Prebiotics in infant formulas", J. DIN. GASTROENTEROL., (2004), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1097/01.mcg.0000128927.91414.93, pages S76 - S79, XP009148684

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.mcg.0000128927.91414.93
    - BOEHM, G.; B. STAHL., "Oligosaccharides from milk.", J. NUTR., (2007), vol. 137, pages 847S - 849S
    - CHO, Y. J.; H. J. SHIN; C. BUCKE, "Purification and biochemical properties of a galactooligosaccharide producing b-galactosidase from Bullera singularis", BIOTECHNOL. LETT, (2003), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1023/B:BILE.0000007077.58019.bb, pages 2107 - 2111, XP055100697

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:BILE.0000007077.58019.bb
    - CREGG, J. M.; T. S. VEDVICK; W. C. RASCHKE, "Recent advances in the expression of foreign genes in Pichia pastoris.", BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0893-905, pages 905 - 910, XP002100307

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0893-905
    - "Human milk oligosaccharides as prebiotics", CUPPA, G. V.; O. GABRELLI., Therapeutic microbology. Probiotics and related strategies, ASM PRESS, (2008), pages 131 - 146
    - DAGHER, S. F.; J. L. WANG; R. J. PATTERSON, "Identification of Galectin-3 as a factor in pre-mRNA splicing.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (1995), vol. 92, pages 1213 - 1217
    - GALLAGHER, S. R., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1995), pages 10.3.1 - 10.3.11
    - GORIN, P. A. J.; H. J. PHAFF; J. F. T. SPENCER, "Structures of Galactosyl-lactose and Galactobiosyl-lactose produced from lactose by Sporobolomyces singularis", CAN. J. CHEM, (1964), vol. 42, pages 1341 - 1344, XP055513397
    - GORIN, P. A. J.; J. F. T. SPENCER; H. J. PHAFF., "Synthesis of b-galacto-b-glucopyranosyl disaccharides by Sporobolomyces singularis.", CAN. J. CHEM., (1964), vol. 42, pages 2307 - 2317
    - GOSLING, A.; G. W. STEVENS; A. R. BARBER; S. E. KENTISH; S. L. GRAS, "Recent advances refining galactooligosaccharide production from lactose", FOOD CHEM., (2010), vol. 121, doi:doi:10.1016/j.foodchem.2009.12.063, pages 307 - 318, XP026916229

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2009.12.063
    - GROSOVA', M. ROSENBERG; REBROS, "Perspectives and applications of immobilised b-galactosidase in food industry - a review.", CZECH J. FOOD SCI., (2008), vol. 26, pages 1 - 14
    - HESTRIN, S.; D. S. FEINGOLD; M. SCHRAMM, "Hexoside hydrolases", METH. ENZYMOL., (1955), vol. 1, pages 231 - 257
    - HIGGINS, D. R., "Introduction to Pichia pastoris.", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 103, pages 1 - 15
    - HOFMANN., "TMbase - A database of membrane spanning proteins segments", BIOL. CHEM. HOPPE-SEYLER, (1993), page 374
    - ISHIKAWA, E.; T. SAKAI; H. IKEMURA; K. MATSUMOTO; H. ABE, "Identification, cloning, and characterization of a Sporobolomyces singularis b-galactosidase-like enzyme involved in galacto-oligosaccharide production.", J. BIOSCI. BIOENG., (2005), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1263/jbb.99.331, pages 331 - 339, XP005665511

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1263/jbb.99.331
    - JENKINS, N.; R. B. PAREKH; D. C. JAMES., "Getting the glycosylation right: Implications for the biotechnology industry.", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0896-975, pages 975 - 981, XP002133654

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0896-975
    - KATAYAMA, K., "Inhibition by copper ion of the activities of b-galactosidase and dehydrogenases of activated sludge.", JAPAN J. WAT. POLLUT. RES., (1984), vol. 7, pages 100 - 107
    - KATAYAMA, K., "Inhibition of the activities of b-galactosidase and dehydrogenases of activated sludge by heavy metals.", WATER RES., (1986), vol. 20, pages 591 - 594
    - KIM, C. S.; E. S. JI; D. K. OH, "A new kinetic model of recombinant b-galactosidase from Kluyveromyces lactis for both hydrolysis and transgalactosylation reactions", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (2004), vol. 316, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.02.118, pages 738 - 743, XP004495948

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.02.118
    - KNOL, J.; P. SCHOLTENS; C. KAFKA; J. STEENBAKKERS; S. GROFL; K. HELM; M. KLARCZYK; H. SCHOPFER; H. M. BOCKLER; J. WELLS, "Colon microflora in infants fed formula with galacto-and fructo-oligosaccharides: More like breast-fed infants", J. PEDIATR. GASTROENTEROL. NUTR., (2005), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1097/00005176-200501000-00007, pages 36 - 42, XP002668009

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005176-200501000-00007
    - KUBY, S. A.; H. A. LARDY, "Purification and kinetics of b-D-galactosidase from Escherichia coli strain-K-12.", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, pages 890 - 896
    - LAEMMLI, U. K., "Cleavage of structural proteins during assembly of head of bacteriophage-T4.", NAT., (1970), vol. 227, doi:doi:10.1038/227680a0, pages 680 - 685, XP055108426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/227680a0
    - LI, P. Z.; A. ANUMANTHAN; X. G. GAO; K. ILANGOVAN; V. V. SUZARA; N. DUZGUNES; V. RENUGOPALAKRISHNAN, "Expression of recombinant proteins in Pichia pastoris.", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 142, doi:doi:10.1007/s12010-007-0003-x, pages 105 - 124, XP055220800

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12010-007-0003-x
    - NERI, D. F. M.; V. M. BALCAO; R. S. COSTA; I. C. A. P. ROCHA; E. M. F. C. FERREIRA; D. P. M. TORRES; L. R. M. RODRIGUES; L. B. CAR, "Galacto- oligosaccharides production during lactose hydrolysis by free Aspergillus oryzae b-galactosidase and immobilized on magnetic polysiloxane-polyvinyl alcohol.", FOOD CHEM., (2009), vol. 115, doi:doi:10.1016/j.foodchem.2008.11.068, pages 92 - 99, XP025993122

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2008.11.068
    - OTIENO, D. O., "Synthesis of b-galactooligosaccharides from lactose using microbial b-galactosidases.", COMPR. REV. FOOD SCI. FOOD SAF., (2010), vol. 9, pages 471 - 482
    - PARK, A. R.; D. K. OH., "Galacto-oligosaccharide production using microbial b-galactosidase: current state and perspectives.", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2010), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1007/S00253-009-2356-2, pages 1279 - 1286, XP002667897

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00253-009-2356-2
    - PHAFF, H. J.; L. D. CARMO-SOUSA, "Four new species of yeast isolated from insect frass in bark of Tsuga heterophylla (Raf.) Sargent", ANTONIE VAN LEEUWENHOEK, (1962), vol. 28, pages 193 - 207
    - RASTALL, R. A.; V. MAITIN., "Prebiotics and synbiotics: towards the next generation", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 13, pages 490 - 496
    - ROBERFROID, M.; G. R. GIBSON; L. HOYLES; A. L. MCCARTNEY; R. RASTALL; I. ROWLAND; D. WOLVERS; B. WATZL; H. SZAJEWSKA; B. STAHL, "Prebiotic effects: metabolic and health benefits", BR. J. NUTR., (2010), vol. 104, pages S1 - S63
    - SAKAI, T.; H. TSUJI; S. SHIBATA; K. HAYAKAWA; K. MATSUMOTO, "Repeated-batch production of galactooligosaccharides from lactose at high concentration by using alginate- immobilized cells of Sporobolomyces singularis YIT 10047", J. GEN. APPL. MICROBIOL., (2008), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.2323/jgam.54.285, pages 285 - 293, XP002552446

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2323/jgam.54.285
    - SCOPES, R., "The effect of temperature on enzymes used in diagnostics.", CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 237, pages 17 - 23
    - SHIN, H. J.; J. M. PARK; J. W. YANG, "Continuous production of galacto- oligosaccharides from lactose by Bullera singularis b-galactosidase immobilized in chitosan beads", PROCESS BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1016/S0032-9592(98)00045-4, pages 787 - 792, XP055151070

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-9592(98)00045-4
    - SHIN, H. J.; J. W. YANG, "Enzymatic production of galactooligosaccharide by Bullera singularis b-galactosidase", J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 484 - 489
    - TEMPLE, L. M.; A. A. WEISS; K. E. WALKER; H. J. BARNES; V. L. CHRISTENSEN; D. M. MIYAMOTO; C. B. SHELTON; P. E. ORNDORFF, "Bordetella avium virulence measured in vivo and in vitro.", INFECT. IMMUN, (1998), vol. 66, pages 5244 - 5251
    - TORRES, D. P. M.; M. D. F. GONGALVES; J. A. TEIXEIRA; L. R. RODRIGUES, "Galacto- oligosaccharides: Production, properties, applications, and significance as prebiotics.", COMPR. REV. FOOD SCI. FOOD SAF., (2010), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1541-4337.2010.00119.x, pages 438 - 454, XP055099117

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1541-4337.2010.00119.x