Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936517

EP2936517 - INDUCTOR SYSTEMS USING FLUX CONCENTRATOR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
1000 Eaton Boulevard
Cleveland, OH 44122 / US
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / OUGHTON, George W., Jr.
15724 Wickershire Curt
Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US
02 / LYNAM, Larry V.
102 Beachwood Drive
Youngsville, North Carolina 27596 / US
03 / WALLACE, Thomas A.
612 Jordan Ridge Lane
Raleigh, North Carolina 27603 / US
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Wimmer, Hubert
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Wimmer, Hubert
WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13814377.113.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013US74856
Priority number, dateUS201261745245P21.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261745245 P
US20131379061208.03.2013         Original published format: US201313790612
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014099638
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936517
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/38, H01F27/28, H01F27/32
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:INDUKTORSYSTEME MIT FLUSSKONZENTRATORSTRUKTUREN[2015/44]
English:INDUCTOR SYSTEMS USING FLUX CONCENTRATOR STRUCTURES[2015/44]
French:SYSTÈMES D'INDUCTEURS UTILISANT DES STRUCTURES DE CONCENTRATION DE FLUX[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2015National basic fee paid 
18.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
28.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YDA]US7205875  (OUGHTON JR GEORGE W [US], et al) [YD] 1-7,11,13-17,21 * the whole document * [A] 8-10,18-20;
 [YA]WO2008008538  (PULSE ENG INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,11,13-17,21 * abstract * * page 19, line 23 - page 22, line 12; figures 3,4 * [A] 8-10,18-20;
 [A]US2012106207  (TSAI HSIN-WEI [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 3b *;
 [A]EP1178501  (TOKIN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 3-6; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004239464  (MIHARA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0122] *
by applicantUS7205875