Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2938738

EP2938738 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LIPIDS FROM BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENI S.p.A.
Piazzale E. Mattei 1
00144 Rome / IT
[2015/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BORTOLO, Rossella
Via Gorizia 29
I-28100 Novara / IT
02 / MIGLIO, Roberta
Via Borzighella 3
I-28047 Oleggio Novara / IT
03 / CUCCHETTI, Daniela
Via IV Novembre 66
I-20012 Cuggiono Milano / IT
 [2015/45]
Representative(s)Cernuzzi, Daniele , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2019/10]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2015/45]Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13814976.023.12.2013
[2015/45]
WO2013EP77940
Priority number, dateIT2012MI0224928.12.2012         Original published format: IT MI20122249
[2015/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014102254
Date:03.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2938738
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014
[2015/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2938738
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/64, C12N1/12, C12N1/22, C11B1/02
[2015/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LIPIDEN AUS BIOMASSE[2015/45]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF LIPIDS FROM BIOMASS[2015/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE LIPIDES À PARTIR DE BIOMASSE[2015/45]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase16.07.2015National basic fee paid 
16.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
26.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/39]HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]LT06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]LT06.03.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/33]LT06.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2012052368  (ENI SPA [IT], et al) [ID] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [ID]WO2010149859  (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI], et al) [ID] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]WO2009063138  (UNIV HELSINKI TECHNOLOGY [FI], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 15 *;
 [A]US2011086386  (CZARTOSKI THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 2-4; examples 1, 14 *
 [A]  - ABU YOUSUF, "Biodiesel from lignocellulosic biomass - Prospects and challenges", WASTE MANAGEMENT, (20121101), vol. 32, no. 11, doi:10.1016/j.wasman.2012.03.008, ISSN 0956-053X, pages 2061 - 2067, XP055078469 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [2.5.] , [0 5.] , [0 6.]; tables 2, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wasman.2012.03.008
by applicantWO2009108773
 WO2012042544
 WO2009063138
 WO2010149859
 US2008102176
 WO2010046051
 WO2012052368
 US5628830
 US5916780
 US6090595
 WO2010069583
 WO2010069516
 EP1728844
    - "Biodiesel generation from oleaginous yeast Rhodotorula glutinis with xylose assimilating capacity", AFRICAN JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 6, no. 18, pages 2130 - 2134
    - J. A. KNIGHT ET AL., "Chemical Basis of the Sulpho-phospho-vanillin Reaction for Estimating Total Serum Lipids", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 199 - 202