EP2938662 - EXPANDABLE VINYL AROMATIC POLYMERS CONTAINING GRAPHITE PARTICLES HAVING A POLYMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/45] | EXPANDABLE VINYL AROMATIC POLYMERS CONTAINING GRAPHITE PARTICLES HAVING A POLYMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION | ||
[2019/10] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URBANCZYK, Laetitia Rue de Mignault 68 B-7100 La Louvière / BE | 02 /
NOWE, Stéphane Chemin des Meuniers F-64360 Monein / FR | 03 /
MICHEL, Jacques Rue Saint Ethon 4 B-7181 Feluy / BE | 04 /
DELEYE, Jean-Claude Ninoofse Steenweg 16 B-1540 Herne / BE | 05 /
LAMBRICHT, Nicolas Clos des Violoneux 16 B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | 06 /
LODEFIER, Philippe L. Vanderzipenstraat 47 B-1780 Wemmel / BE | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | AWA Benelux Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme - Bât. K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | ||
Former [2015/45] | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | Application number, filing date | 13815728.4 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013EP77412 | Priority number, date | EP20120199751 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12199751 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014102139 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2938662 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938662 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/16, C08J9/228, C08K3/04, C08L25/06 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
B29C44/3442 (EP,US);
B29C44/3461 (EP,US);
B29C48/0012 (EP,US);
B29C48/025 (EP,US);
B29C48/362 (EP,US);
B29C48/363 (EP,US);
B29C48/70 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (US);
C08J9/0095 (US);
C08J9/16 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/02 (US);
C08J2325/04 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | C08J9/00, B29C47/08, B29C47/70, B29C44/34, B29C47/00, B29C47/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXPANDIERBARE VINYLAROMATISCHE POLYMERE ENTHALTEND GRAPHITPARTIKEL MIT POLYMODALER PARTIKELGRÖSSENVERTEILUNG | [2019/10] | English: | EXPANDABLE VINYL AROMATIC POLYMERS CONTAINING GRAPHITE PARTICLES HAVING A POLYMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION | [2019/10] | French: | POLYMÈRES VINYLIQUES AROMATIQUES EXPANSIBLES CONTENANT DES PARTICULES DE GRAPHITE PRÉSENTANT UNE DISTRIBUTION POLYMODALE DE LEUR TAILLE | [2019/10] |
Former [2015/45] | EXPANDIERBARE AROMATISCHE VINYLPOLYMERE MIT GRAPHITPARTIKELN MIT POLYMODALER PARTIKELGRÖSSENVERTEILUNG | ||
Former [2015/45] | EXPANDABLE VINYL AROMATIC POLYMERS CONTAINING GRAPHITE PARTICLES HAVING A POLYMODAL PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION | ||
Former [2015/45] | POLYMÈRES VINYLIQUES AROMATIQUES EXPANSIBLES AMÉLIORÉS | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 09.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2020
26.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese / IT Opponent's representative Hansen, Norbert Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2020
26.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Versalis S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese / IT Opponent's representative Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 18.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.09.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.10.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/48] | Appeal following opposition | 13.01.2021 | Appeal received No. T0033/21 | 13.01.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 25.01.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.08.2019 | AT | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | IE | 19.12.2019 | LU | 19.12.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IE | 19.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
AT | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | HR | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP2358798 (POLIMERI EUROPA SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-13 * example 2 * * claim - *; | [A]US2011213045 (HANDL WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * example 2 * * paragraph [0017] ** claims 1-7 * | Opposition | US6340713 | WO03106544 | US2005156344 | WO2006007995 | WO2007045454 | WO2008141767 | WO2008141766 | US2009039537 | WO2010128369 | EP2326685 | WO2012024708 | WO2013000679 | WO2013092322 | - "The Power of Synergies , TIM REX® Graphite brochure", (20050000), XP055722188 | - "Polywax Polythylenes", BakerHughes,, (2011), XP055722198 | - "Luzenac 20M0", Imerys product data sheet, (2011), XP055722204 | - "A guidebook to particle size analysis", Horiba sales brochure, (20120000), XP055722206 | - "Technical data sheet UF2 99,5,", Graphit Kropfm0hle AG, (20040513), XP055722208 | - "Technical data sheet MICROMAC UFC", Macri chemicals, (200811211), XP055722209 | - TIMREX SFG6, Technical Data Sheet, Version 09/06, Timcal/lmerys | - "TIMREX KS6, Technical Data Sheet,", Version 09/06, Timcal/lmerys Timcal Graphite and Carbon, (200609), XP055722210 |