Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787497

EP2787497 - FAILURE-ASSESSMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SASABUCHI Yoji
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / KOIKE Hiroyuki
c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date13816074.208.07.2013
WO2013JP68618
Priority number, dateJP2012015496310.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012154963
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014010546
Date:16.01.2014
Language:JA
[2014/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787497
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/16, B60R16/02, G01S13/86, H04N7/18
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON DEFEKTEN[2014/41]
English:FAILURE-ASSESSMENT APPARATUS[2014/41]
French:APPAREIL D'ÉVALUATION DE DÉFAUT[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014Translation filed 
03.06.2014National basic fee paid 
03.06.2014Search fee paid 
03.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
22.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/10]
31.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2007163258  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [I] 2-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5617085  (TSUTSUMI KAZUMICHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6414712  (WANIELIK GERD [DE] ET AL) [A] 4 * column 2, line 34 - column 2, line 44; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006274149  (YOSHIZAWA RYOUZO [JP]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0067]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2008266052  (SCHMID ROLAND [DE]) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005062615  (BRAEUCHLE GOETZ [DE] ET AL) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007018470  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2008215912  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2007163258  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS, INC.);
 [A]JP2006292621  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2003252147  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [A]JP2009029367  (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2005157765