Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787497


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.02.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
30.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2016 First examination report
27.02.2016 Amendment by applicant
11.09.2015 Change - extension states published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
14.08.2015 Change - classification published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
14.08.2015 Change - classification published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
14.08.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
02.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.03.2015 Change - representative
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication