Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2876585

EP2876585 - NETWORK TRANSACTION PLATFORM SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING MERCHANDISE SUBSCRIPTION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.2017  [2017/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Changshengtiandi Ecommerce Co. Ltd.
8/F Building 2
Topnew Tower
15 Guanghua Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100026 / CN
[2015/22]
Inventor(s)01 / YAN, Yanchun
8/F Building 2 Topnew Tower
15 Guanghua Road
ChaoyangDistrict
Beijing 100026 / CN
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/22]
Application number, filing date13816092.414.03.2013
WO2013CN72584
Priority number, dateCN2012124071811.07.2012         Original published format: CN201210240718
[2015/22]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014008765
Date:16.01.2014
Language:ZH
[2014/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2876585
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN16.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2016/10]
Former International [2015/22]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
TitleGerman:NETZWERKTRANSAKTIONSPLATTFORMSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT WARENABONNEMENTSTRUKTUR[2015/22]
English:NETWORK TRANSACTION PLATFORM SYSTEM AND METHOD HAVING MERCHANDISE SUBSCRIPTION STRUCTURE[2015/22]
French:SYSTÈME DE PLATEFORME DE TRANSACTION DE RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉ COMPORTANT UNE STRUCTURE D'ABONNEMENT À DES MARCHANDISES[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2015Translation filed 
11.02.2015National basic fee paid 
11.02.2015Search fee paid 
11.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
06.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/12]
24.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007174341  (SARIPALLI VARMA [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * abstract *
International search[Y]CN101944221  (SHANGHAI TENGTANG DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD);
 [Y]CN101763597  (UNIV SHANDONG);
 [A]CN102542409  (UNIV NANJING);
 [A]CN102024230  (LANTOP INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD)