Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2928962

EP2928962 - POLYAMIDE COMPOSITION, METHOD, AND ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/42]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FORTUIJN, Johannes E.
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4621 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
02 / GRCEV, Snezana
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4611 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/45]
Former [2015/42]Kreller-Schober, Maria
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13817736.504.12.2013
[2015/42]
WO2013IB60646
Priority number, dateUS20121370530905.12.2012         Original published format: US201213705309
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014087354
Date:12.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2928962
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014
[2015/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2928962
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L77/00, C08J3/22, C08K5/5313, C08K7/14, C08K5/3492, C08K3/38, C08L83/12, C08L71/12
[2015/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYAMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ARTIKEL DARAUS[2015/42]
English:POLYAMIDE COMPOSITION, METHOD, AND ARTICLE[2015/42]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLYAMIDE, PROCÉDÉ ET ARTICLE[2015/42]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2015National basic fee paid 
03.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2016Fee for grant paid
23.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2016
Opposition(s)10.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2013
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
TR09.11.2016
IE04.12.2016
LU04.12.2016
MT04.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU04.12.2013
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE04.12.2016
LU04.12.2016
MT04.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2018/30]HU04.12.2013
AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CY09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
MK09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE04.12.2016
LU04.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/49]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SI09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
IE04.12.2016
LU04.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
MC09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
BG09.02.2017
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
IT09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
SM09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT09.11.2016
BE09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
SK09.11.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
EE09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RO09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT09.11.2016
CZ09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT09.11.2016
DK09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT09.11.2016
ES09.11.2016
FI09.11.2016
HR09.11.2016
LT09.11.2016
LV09.11.2016
NL09.11.2016
PL09.11.2016
RS09.11.2016
SE09.11.2016
BE31.12.2016
NO09.02.2017
GR10.02.2017
IS09.03.2017
PT09.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV09.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2011152420  (ELKOVITCH MARK [US], et al) [X] 18 * claims 1-22; paragraphs 1-2 and 12; 66; 68-69; 70-72 and 115; examples 4-9 of Table 8 in paragraph 125 * [Y] 1-17,19-23;
 [Y]WO2010039522  (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL], et al) [Y] 1-17,23 * claims 1-20; paragraphs 1-2; 13-17; 19; 36 and 51; examples *;
 [Y]  - SCHMITT ET AL, "Phosphorus-based flame retardants for thermoplastics", PLASTICS ADDITIVES AND COMPOUNDING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXOFRD, GB, (20070501), vol. 9, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1464-391X(07)70067-3, ISSN 1464-391X, pages 26 - 30, XP022095024 [Y] 10-12,16,17,19-22 * Page 26, right column, second paragraph to page 28, second column *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1464-391X(07)70067-3
by applicantUS8017697
 US4970272
 US5132365
 US6593411
 US7226963