Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2934157

EP2934157 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARING A MILK PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sievecorp Europe B.V.
Lichtfabriekplein 1
2031 TE Haarlem / NL
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / MENDEL, Paul Willem
c/o Lichtfabriekplein 1
NL-2031 TE Haarlem / NL
02 / ZANDHUIS, Jorine
c/o Lichtfabriekplein 1
NL-2031 TE Haarlem / NL
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13818505.320.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013NL50929
Priority number, dateNL2012201002420.12.2012         Original published format: NL 2010024
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014098596
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2934157
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A23C3/00, A23C9/142
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MILCHPRODUKTS[2015/44]
English:A PROCESS FOR PREPARING A MILK PRODUCT[2015/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN PRODUIT LAITIER[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2015National basic fee paid 
17.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/34]
17.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/34]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]FR2953686  (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR]) [X] 17-21 * page 25; figure 3 * [A] 1-16;
 [XAI]EP1307106  (FRIESLAND BRANDS BV [NL]) [X] 17-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0018] , [0019]; claims 1,8 * [A] 1-16 [I] 21;
 [XD]US2010310711  (KENDELL LAMAR CHET [US]) [XD] 17-20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0021] , [0049] , [ 0053] , [ 0058]; figure 1 *;
 [XA]US2012015082  (HOLST HANS HENRIK [DK], et al) [X] 17-20 * claims 1, 13, 14, 38-44 * [A] 1-16,21;
 [XD]WO2010085957  (ARLA FOODS AMBA [DK], et al) [XD] 17-20;
 [A]EP0879635  (KONINKL GROLSCH N V [NL]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - "Technology increases processing capacity for dairy products", FILTRATION AND SEPARATION, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, vol. 45, ISSN 0015-1882, (20080101), page 4, (20080101), XP027558884 [X] 17-20 * the whole document * [I] 1-16,21
 [XI]  - BRITO-DE LA FUENTE E ET AL, "Microfiltration of whole milk with silicon microsieves: Effect of process variables", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, PART A, INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS, XX, vol. 88, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.CHERD.2009.09.014, ISSN 0263-8762, (20100501), pages 653 - 660, (20091104), XP027065969 [X] 17-20 * Sections 1., 2.2., 2.3. * [I] 1-16,21

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cherd.2009.09.014
 [A]  - GIRONES M ET AL, "Flux stabilization of silicon nitride microsieves by backpulsing and surface modification with PEG moieties", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 299, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCIS.2006.03.006, ISSN 0021-9797, (20060715), pages 831 - 840, (20060715), XP024909452 [A] 1-21 * Sections 2.1. and 2.6. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcis.2006.03.006
 [A]  - GIRONES I NOGUE M ET AL, "Vibrating polymeric microsieves: Antifouling strategies for microfiltration", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 285, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MEMSCI.2006.09.001, ISSN 0376-7388, (20061115), pages 323 - 333, (20061115), XP024931674 [A] 1-21 * Sections 2.1., 3.4., fig. 12. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.memsci.2006.09.001
by applicantWO2010085957
 US2010310711
 WO2005023404
 EP1667788
 WO2008127098
    - Tetra Pak Dairy processing Handbook, (2003),