Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2771468 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 29874
26.06.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
26.06.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
04.05.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.04.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
26.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.04.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 42
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 41
19.04.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.04.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.04.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.02.2017 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
17.02.2017 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
02.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.02.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
31.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.01.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
18.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.01.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 3
11.01.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 14
23.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 67
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 97
23.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
23.12.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 297
23.12.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
21.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.12.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
31.10.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.10.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
05.10.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.06.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 25
30.06.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.06.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.06.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 142
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2016 Rejection of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.05.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
18.05.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
11.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.03.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
24.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
11.02.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
22.12.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
02.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 1
02.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.11.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
26.11.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
26.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
18.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 5
18.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 47
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 146
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 124
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 298
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 276
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 292
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 224
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 324
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 464
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 362
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 158
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 180
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 406
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 298
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 242
18.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
17.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 31
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 122
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 276
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 362
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 146
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 242
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 464
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 324
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 292
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 180
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 224
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 162
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 298
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 144
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 406
17.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 298
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
11.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 24
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 48
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 51
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 47
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 33
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 46
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 223
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 291
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 405
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 69
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 322
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 306
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 242
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 297
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 158
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 146
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 298
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 63
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 238
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 361
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 463
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 227
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 179
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 275
11.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
10.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 69
10.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 69
10.11.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 57
10.11.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 5
10.11.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 106
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.11.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 47
10.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.11.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 162
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 143
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 352
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.11.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.11.2015 Request for grant of an International application Opposition 5
30.10.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.10.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 40
26.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.10.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 68
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
26.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
26.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 300
02.09.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
25.08.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 69
17.08.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 323
14.08.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.08.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
17.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.07.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
17.06.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.06.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.01.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.12.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
19.12.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.12.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.12.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 152
14.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
14.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.10.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.10.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
16.10.2014 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 8
14.10.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 37
01.10.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 7
01.10.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
01.10.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 5
01.10.2014 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
01.10.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
01.10.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
11.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 68
21.08.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.08.2014 Republication of A1/A2/A3 Pamphlet - corrections, alterations or supplements Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 322
21.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.07.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
15.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
15.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 80
15.07.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 352
15.07.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 126
10.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 298
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 405
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 223
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 306
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 146
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 297
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 242
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 291
07.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 463
07.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.06.2014 Annex International Searching Authority 159
19.06.2014 Annex Search / examination 167
19.06.2014 Annex Search / examination 6
19.06.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.06.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 158
19.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.06.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
18.06.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
17.06.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
28.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
28.05.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
28.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
27.05.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Annex Search / examination 44
27.05.2014 Annex Search / examination 113
27.05.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 112
27.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
21.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
27.12.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
27.12.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 7
27.12.2013 Description International Searching Authority 105
27.12.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 44