Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771468

EP2771468 - ENGINEERING OF SYSTEMS, METHODS AND OPTIMIZED GUIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR SEQUENCE MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
415 Main Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2018/16]
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
415 Main Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
7 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Feng
100 Pacific Street
Apt. 11
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / CONG, Le
100 Memorial Dr
Apt 8-21B
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
03 / HSU, Patrick
37 Kirkland St., Apt. B1
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / RAN, Fei
30 Clarendon Street
Boston, MA 02116 / US
 [2015/39]
Former [2014/36]01 / ZHANG, Feng
100 Pacific Street
Apt. 11
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / CONG, Le
1200 Massachusetts Ave., Apt. 33E
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
03 / HSU, Patrick
37 Kirkland St., Apt. B1
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / RAN, Fei
129 St. Botolph St., Apt. 2
Boston, MA 02115 / US
Representative(s)De Clercq, Ann G. Y. , et al
De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Williams, Gareth Owen
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date13818570.712.12.2013
WO2013US74819
Priority number, dateUS201261736527P12.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261736527 P
US201361748427P02.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361748427 P
US201361758468P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758468 P
US201361769046P25.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361769046 P
US201361791409P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361791409 P
US201361802174P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361802174 P
US201361806375P28.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361806375 P
US201361814263P20.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361814263 P
US201361819803P06.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361819803 P
US201361828130P28.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361828130 P
US201361835931P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361835931 P
US201361836127P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361836127 P
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014093712
Date:19.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771468
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2771468
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON SYSTEMEN, VERFAHREN UND OPTIMIERTEN FÜHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SEQUENZMANIPULATION[2014/36]
English:ENGINEERING OF SYSTEMS, METHODS AND OPTIMIZED GUIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR SEQUENCE MANIPULATION[2014/36]
French:FABRICATION DE SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE GUIDE OPTIMISÉES POUR LA MANIPULATION DE SÉQUENCES[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2014National basic fee paid 
27.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
11.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2014Observations by third parties
07.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2014Fee for grant paid
19.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14170383.5  / EP2784162
EP15154539.9  / EP2896697
EP15154565.4  / EP2940140
EP15154566.2  / EP2921557
EP16194919.3  / EP3144390
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Nikolaistrasse 15
80802 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/43]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Nikolaistrasse 15
80802 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2018/35]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2018/16]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2017/12]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2017/06]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2016/24]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015  20.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 03  10.11.2015  23.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazalles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 04  10.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 05  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 06  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 07  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
 08  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 09  11.11.2015  24.11.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Opponent's representative
Wilding, James Roger
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2015/51]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 02  10.11.2015   
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
Former [2015/49]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2015  29.10.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
22.12.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.06.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.03.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition28.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0844/18
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2013
AL11.02.2015
BG11.02.2015
CY11.02.2015
HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
MC11.02.2015
MK11.02.2015
MT11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
SI11.02.2015
SM11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU12.12.2013
BG11.02.2015
CY11.02.2015
HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
MC11.02.2015
MK11.02.2015
MT11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
SI11.02.2015
SM11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2017/39]HU12.12.2013
BG11.02.2015
CY11.02.2015
HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
MC11.02.2015
MT11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
SI11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2016/33]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
MC11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
SI11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2016/12]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
SI11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2015/50]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
RO11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2015/39]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
LV11.02.2015
RS11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2015/37]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
GR12.05.2015
Former [2015/36]HR11.02.2015
LT11.02.2015
Former [2015/35]LT11.02.2015
Cited inInternational search[XPA]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030 [XP] 1-16,20-22,37-46,48-53 * abstract * * page 820, column l * [A] 17-19,23-36,47

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [P]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [P] * figures S1, S8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [XI]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-16,20-22,36-46,49,51-53

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    [ ] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067747 [ ] * figures S7, S8, S11; table S1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [A]  - G. GASIUNAS ET AL, "PNAS Plus: Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39, doi:10.1073/pnas.1208507109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588 [A] 1-53 * abstract * * page E2579 * * page E2583 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
 [AP]  - JIANG WENYAN ET AL, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 233 - 239, XP002699849 [AP] 1-53 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508
 [A]  - BLAKE WIEDENHEFT ET AL, "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, doi:10.1038/nature10886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 [A] 1-53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886
 [A]  - ELITZA DELTCHEVA ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 [A] 1-53 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
 [A]  - MICHAEL P TERNS ET AL, "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, ISSN 1369-5274, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823 [A] 1-53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005
 [IP]  - GAJ THOMAS ET AL, "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2013.04.004, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 397 - 405, XP028571313 [IP] 1-53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004
 [IP]  - WANG HAOYI ET AL, "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", CELL, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2013.04.025, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358 [IP] 1-53 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
 [IP]  - LUKE A. GILBERT ET AL, "CRISPR-Mediated Modular RNA-Guided Regulation of Transcription in Eukaryotes", CELL, (20130701), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 442 - 451, XP055115843 [IP] 1-53 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
 [IP]  - KRZYSZTOF CHYLINSKI ET AL, "The tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR-Cas immunity systems", RNA BIOLOGY, (20130501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.4161/rna.24321, ISSN 1547-6286, pages 726 - 737, XP055116068 [IP] 1-53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
by applicantUS4873316
 EP0264166
 US2011059502
 US5049386
 US4946787
 US4897355
 WO9117424
 WO9116024
 US4186183
 US4217344
 US4235871
 US4261975
 US4485054
 US4501728
 US4774085
 US4837028
 US4797368
 WO9324641
 US5173414
 US2003087817
 US6603061
 US7868149
 US2009100536
    - GOEDDEL, GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185
    - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530
    - MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, no. L, pages 466 - 472
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1981), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1527 - 31
    - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40
    - AMRANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315
    - STUDIER ET AL., GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89
    - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234
    - KUIJAN; HERSKOWITZ, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943
    - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123
    - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165
    - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39
    - SEED, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840
    - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195
    - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277
    - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275
    - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733
    - BANEIJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740
    - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748
    - BYRNE; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477
    - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916
    - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379
    - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546
    - ISHINO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5429 - 5433
    - NAKATA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3553 - 3556
    - GROENEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 10, pages 1057 - 1065
    - HOE ET AL., EMERG. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 254 - 263
    - MASEPOHL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1996), vol. 1307, pages 26 - 30
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 85 - 93
    - JANSSEN ET AL., OMICS J. INTEG. BIOL., (2002), vol. 6, pages 23 - 33
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 36, pages 244 - 246
    - VAN EMBDEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, pages 2393 - 2401
    - JANSEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 43, pages 1565 - 1575
    - NAKAMURA, Y. ET AL., "Codon usage tabulated from the international DNA sequence databases: status for the year 2000", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/28.1.292, page 292, XP002941557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.1.292
    - ZUKER; STIEGLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, pages 133 - 148
    - A.R. GRUBER ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 106, no. 1, pages 23 - 24
    - PA CARR; GM CHURCH, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 62
    - ANDERSON, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813
    - NABEL; FELGNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 211 - 217
    - MITANI; CASKEY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 162 - 166
    - DILLON, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175
    - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460
    - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1 149 - 1154
    - VIGNE, RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36
    - KREMER; PERRICAUDET, BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 31 - 44
    - YU ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 13 - 26
    - CRYSTAL, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 404 - 410
    - BLAESE, CANCER GENE THER, (1995), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297
    - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389
    - REMY ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654
    - GAO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722
    - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820
    - BUCHSCHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2731 - 2739
    - JOHANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1635 - 1640
    - SOMMNERFELT ET AL., VIROL, (1990), vol. 176, pages 58 - 59
    - WILSON ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 2374 - 2378
    - MILLER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224
    - WEST ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 160, pages 38 - 47
    - KOTIN, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801
    - MUZYCZKA, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 94, page 1351
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL, (1985), vol. 5, pages 3251 - 3260
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, pages 2072 - 2081
    - HERMONAT; MUZYCZKA, PNAS, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470
    - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 03822 - 3828
    - MORRELL ET AL., "Crop genomics:advances and applications", NAT REV GENET, (20111229), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 85 - 96
    - MCLVOR EL; POLAK U; NAPIERALA M., "New insights into repeat instability: role of RNA?DNA hybrids", RNA BIOL., (201009), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 551 - 8
    - TANGRI S ET AL., "Rationally engineered therapeutic proteins with reduced immunogenicity", J IMMUNOL., (20050315), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3187 - 96
    - GRUBER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 36, page W70
    - SAPRANAUSAKS, CUCLEIC ACIS RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 39, page 9275
    - GASIUNAS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2012), vol. 109, page E2579
    - JINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, page 816
    - MAKAROVA ET AL., NAT REV MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 9, page 467
    - URNOV, F.D.; REBAR, E.J.; HOLMES, M.C.; ZHANG, H.S.; GREGORY, P.D., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", NAT. REV. GENET, (2010), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg2842, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - BOGDANOVE, A.J.; VOYTAS, D.F. TAL EFFECTORS: CUSTOMIZABLE PROTEINS FOR DNA TARGETING, SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 333, pages 1843 - 1846
    - STODDARD, B.L., "Homing endonuclease structure and function.", Q. REV. BIOPHYS, (2005), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1017/S0033583505004063, pages 49 - 95, XP008065807

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0033583505004063
    - BAE, T.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Allelic replacement in Staphylococcus aureus with inducible counter-selection.", PLASMID, (2006), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005, pages 58 - 63, XP024939950

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005
    - SUNG, C.K.; LI, H.; CLAVERYS, J.P.; MONISON, D.A., "An rpsL cassette, janus, for gene replacement through negative selection in Streptococcus pneumoniae", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5190 - 5196
    - SHARAN, S.K.; THOMASON, L.C.; KUZNETSOV, S.G.; COURT, D.L., "Recombineering: a homologous recombination-based method of genetic engineering", NAT. PROTOC., (2009), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nprot.2008.227, pages 206 - 223, XP001525689

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2008.227
    - JINEK, M. ET AL., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity.", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - DEVEAU. H.; GARNEAU, J.E.; MOINEAU, S., "CRISPR-Cas system and its role in phage- bacteria interactions", ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL, (2010), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123, pages 475 - 493, XP055067789

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123
    - HORVATH, P.; BARRANGOU, R., "CRISPR-Cas, the immune system of bacteria and archaea", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1179555, pages 167 - 170, XP055016971

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1179555
    - TERNS, M.P.; TERNS, R.M., "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems.", CURR. OPIN. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005
    - VAN DER OOST, J.; JORE, M.M.; WESTRA, E.R.; LUNDGREN, M.; BROUNS, S.J., "CRISPR-based adaptive and heritable immunity in prokaryotes", TRENDS. BIOCHEM. SCI, (2009), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002, pages 401 - 407, XP002559963

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002
    - BROUNS, S.J. ET AL., "Small C'RISPR RNAs guide antiviral defense in prokaryotes", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1159689, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689
    - CARTE, J.; WANG, R.; LI, H.; TERNS, R.M.; TERNS, M.P., "Cas6 is an endoribonuclease that generates guide RNAs for invader defense in prokaryotes", GENES DEV., (2008), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1101/gad.1742908, pages 3489 - 3496, XP055054069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1742908
    - DELTCHEVA, E. ET AL., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III.", NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, doi:doi:10.1038/nature09886, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MANIV, I.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "Mature clustered, regularly interspaced, short palindromic repeats RNA (crRNA) length is measured by a ruler mechanism anchored at the precursor processing site", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2011), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1112832108, pages 21218 - 21222, XP055250498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1112832108
    - HAURWITZ, R.E.; JINEK, M.; WIEDENHEFT, B.; ZHOU, K.; DOUDNA, J.A., "Sequence- and structure-specific RNA processing by a CRISPR endonuclease", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 329, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1192272, pages 1355 - 1358, XP055244668

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1192272
    - DEVEAU, H. ET AL., "Phage response to CRISPR-encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", J. BACTERIOL, (2008), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.01412-07, pages 1390 - 1400, XP002679468

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01412-07
    - MAKAROVA, K.S.; ARAVIND, L.; WOLF, Y.I.; KOONIN, E.V., "Unification of Cas protein families and a simple scenario for the origin and evolution of CRISPR-Cas systems", BIOL. DIRECT., (2011), vol. 6, page 38
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.2357, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - BROUNS, S.J., "MoLecular biology. A Swiss army knife of immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", MOL. THER., (2012), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/mt.2012.171, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - BIKARD, D.; HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MUCIDA, D.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "CRISPR interference can prevent natural transformation and virulence acquisition during in vivo bacterial infection", CELL HOST MICROBE, (2012), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003, pages 177 - 186, XP028934538

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003
    - ZAHNER, D.; HAKENBECK, R., "The Streptococcus pneumoniae beta-galactosidase is a surface protein.", J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000, pages 5919 - 5921, XP002529681

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; DEDENT, A.C.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Sortases and the art of anchoring proteins to the envelopes of gram-positive bacteria.", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006, pages 192 - 221, XP002459580

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006
    - MOTAMEDI, M.R.; SZIGETY, S.K.; ROSENBERG, S.M., "Double-strand-break repair recombination in Escherichia coli: physical evidence for a DNA replication mechanism in vivo", GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2889 - 2903
    - HOSAKA, T. ET AL., "The novel mutation K87E in ribosomal protein S12 enhances protein synthesis activity during the late growth phase in Escherichia coli.", MOL. GENET. GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 271, pages 317 - 324
    - COSTANTINO, N.; COURT, D.L., "Enhanced levels of lambda Red-mediated recombinants in mismatch repair mutants", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 15748 - 15753
    - EDGAR, R.; QIMRON, U., "The Escherichia coli CRISPR system protects from lambda lysogenization, lysogens, and prophage induction", J. BACTERIOL., (2010), vol. 192, pages 6291 - 6294
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; SONTHEIMER, E.J., "Self versus non-self discrimination during CRISPR RNA-directed immunity", NATURE, (2010), vol. 463, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08703, pages 568 - 571, XP055118462

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08703
    - FISCHER, S. ET AL., "An archaeal immune system can detect multiple Protospacer Adjacent Motifs (PAMs) to target invader DNA..I.", BIOL. CHEM., (2012), vol. 287, pages 33351 - 33363
    - GUDBERGSDOTTIR, S. ET AL., "Dynamic properties of the Sulfolobus CRISPR-Cas and CRISPR/Cmr systems when challenged with vector-borne viral and plasmid genes and protospacers.", MOL. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 79, pages 35 - 49
    - WANG, H.H. ET AL., "Genome-scale promoter engineering by coselection MAGE", NAT METHODS, (2012), vol. 9, pages 591 - 593
    - HOSKINS, J. ET AL., "Genome of the bacterium Streptococcus pneumoniae strain R6", J. BACTERIOL, (2001), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001, pages 5709 - 5717, XP002231307

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001
    - HAVARSTEIN, L.S.; COOMARASWAMY, G.; MORRISON, D.A., "An unmodified heptadecapeptide pheromone induces competence for genetic transformation in Streptococcus pneumoniae.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140, pages 11140 - 11144, XP000892151

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140
    - HORINOUCHI, S.; WEISBLUM, B., "Nucleotide sequence and functional map of pC194, a plasmid that specifies inducible chloramphenicol resistance", J. BACTERIOL., (1982), vol. 150, pages 815 - 825
    - HORTON, R.M., "In Vitro Recombination and Mutagenesis of DNA : SOEing Together Tailor-Made Genes.", METHODS MOL. BIOL, (1993), vol. 15, pages 251 - 261
    - PODBIELSKI, A.; SPELLERBERG, B.; WOISCHNIK, M.; POHL, B.; LUTTICKEN, R., "Novel series of plasmid vectors for gene inactivation and expression analysis in group A streptococci (GAS", GENE, (1996), vol. 177, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3, pages 137 - 147, XP004043388

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3
    - HUSMANN, L.K.; SCOTT, J.R.; LINDAHL, G.; STENBERG, L., "Expression of the Arp protein, a member of the M protein family, is not sufficient to inhibit phagocytosis of Streptococcus pyogenes.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 63, pages 345 - 348
    - GIBSON. D.G. ET AL., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318
 WO1994US05700
otherWO2014093661
    - JINEK M. ET AL, "A PROGRAMMABLE DUAL-RNA-GUIDED DNA ENDONUCLEASE IN ADAPTIVE BACTERIAL IMMUNITY (SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL)", SCIENCE, vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - CONG L. ET AL, "MULTIPLEX GENOME ENGINEERING USING CRISPR/CAS SYSTEMS", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - MALI P. ET AL, "RNA-GUIDED HUMAN GENOME ENGINEERING VIA CAS9", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1232033, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - WOONG Y HWANG ET AL, "EFFICIENT GENOME EDITING IN ZEBRAFISH USING A CRISPR-CAS SYSTEM", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201303), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1038/NBT.2501, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
OppositionWO2014093694
    - Rainer Schulte, "Applicant deemed to be entitled", Rainer Schulte, Rainer Schulte, Patentgesetz mit Europäischem Patentübereinkommen, 9. Auflage, (20140000), page 376, XP055340142
    - "Voraussetzungen für die Inanspruchnahme der Unionspriorität", WIECZOREK. et al., Die Unionspriorität im Patentrecht Patentrecht - Grundfragen des Artikels 4 der Pariser Verbandsübereinkunft, (19750000), pages 128 - 149, ISBN 978-3-452-17822-0, XP055340146
    - SAUER, "Site-specific DNA recombination in mammalian cells by the Cre recombinase of bacteriophage P1.", PNAS, (19880000), vol. 85, no. 14, pages 5166 - 70, XP000615552

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.14.5166
    - REISS, "RecA protein stimulates homologous recombination in plants", PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 3094 - 98, XP002113813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.7.3094
    - RAYMOND, "High-Efficiency FLP and ΦC31 Site-Specific Recombination in Mammalian Cells", Plos One, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 1, page e162, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - CARNEY, "Induction of DNA Double-Strand Breaks by Electroporation of Restriction Enzymes into Mammalian Cells", CARNEY, Henderson Daryl S., DNA Repair Protocols, (19990000), vol. 113, pages 465 - 71, ISBN 978-1-59259-675-1, XP055340155

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/1-59259-675-4:465
    - MORGAN, "INDUCIBLE EXPRESSION AND CYTOGENETIC EFFECTS OF THE ECORI RESTRICTION ENDONUCLEASE IN CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELLS", Cell Biol, (19880000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 4204 - 11, XP008014767
    - HARCK et al., Unionsprioritat, (20020700), pages 1 - 44, XP055340157
    - BREMI., "Traps when transferring priority rights, or When in Rome do as the Romans do: A discussion of some recent European and national case law and its practical implications", Institute of Professional Representatives before the European Patent Office, (20100100), pages 17 - 24, XP055340164
    - LIEBER, "The mechanism of double-strand DNA break repair by the nonhomologous DNA end-joining pathway.", Annu Rev Biochem, (20100000), vol. 79, no. 1, pages 181 - 211, XP055340167

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.biochem.052308.093131
    - JENSEN, "An update on targeted gene repair in mammalian cells: methods and mechanisms", Journal of Biomedical Science, (20110000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 1 - 14, XP021085735

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1423-0127-18-10
    - DAVIS, "Zinc Finger Nucleases for Genome Editing", Genetic Engineering and Biotechnology News, (20100000), vol. 30, no. 13, XP055340181
    - MUSSOLINO., "A novel TALE nuclease scaffold enables high genome editing activity in combination with low toxicity", Nucleic Acid Res, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9283 - 9293, XP055021128

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr597
    - YARRIS, "Programmable DNA Scissors Found for Bacterial Immune System", Berkeley Lab, (20120628), URL: http://newscenter.lbl.gov/2012/06/28/programmable-dna.scissors/, XP055340187
    - GOLIC, "RNA-Guided Nucleases: A New Era for Engineering the Genomes of Model and Nonmodel Organisms", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, no. 2, pages 303 - 308, XP055340188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.155093
    - XU, "The Next Generation Biotechnology for Apple Improvement and Beyond: The CRISPR/Cas9 Story", New York Fruit Quarterly, (20130000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 19 - 22, XP055340191
    - CHO, "Heritable Gene Knockout in Caenorhabditis elegans by Direct Injection of Cas9-sgRNA Ribonucleoproteins", Genetics, (20131100), vol. 195, no. 3, pages 1177 - 1180, XP055102693

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.155853
    - CARROLL, "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Therapy, (20081101), vol. 15, no. 22, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - REYON et al., "FLASH assembly of TALENs for high-throughput genome editing", Nature Biotech, (20120408), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 460 - 465, XP055171169

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471142727.mb1216s103