Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2934255

EP2934255 - TUB WITH A DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, TR
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Altura Leiden Holding B.V.
Hagenweg 1 F
4131 LX Vianen ZH / NL
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUS, Heinz, G.
Les Ligures
2 rue Honoré Labande
MC-98000 / MC
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Schmitt, Meinrad
Reble, Klose & Schmitt GbR
Patente + Marken
Postfach 12 15 19
68066 Mannheim / DE
[2015/44]
Application number, filing date13818666.319.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013EP03854
Priority number, dateDE20122012127U19.12.2012         Original published format: DE 202012012127 U
[2015/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014095063
Date:26.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2934255
Date:28.10.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2934255
Date:08.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47K3/00
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WANNE MIT EINER TÜR[2015/44]
English:TUB WITH A DOOR[2015/44]
French:BAIGNOIRE MUNIE D'UNE PORTE[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2015National basic fee paid 
12.06.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
26.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2016Fee for grant paid
29.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2016
Opposition(s)09.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2013
AL08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
TR08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU19.12.2013
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU19.12.2013
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU19.12.2013
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
BE31.12.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011088159  (KNAPP SCOTT R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9-12 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0114]; figures 1-33; claims 24-26 * [I] 7,8
 [I]US2570053  (FOWLER ARTHUR E ET AL) [I] 1-12 * column 4, line 11 - line 42; figures 1-25 *
 [I]US2011167555  (ZIERLER WOLFGANG [AT] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3c *