Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3085196

EP3085196 - CELLULAR NETWORK WITH CONTROL PLANE DECOUPLED FROM USER PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via Gaetano Negri, 1
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BARBERIS, Sergio
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
02 / CALOCHIRA, Giorgio
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
03 / MURATORE, Flavio
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
04 / SCHIAVONI, Andrea
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli 274
I-10148 Torino / IT
 [2016/43]
Representative(s)Maccalli, Marco , et al
Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini, 40
20124 Milano / IT
[2016/43]
Application number, filing date13818744.820.12.2013
[2016/43]
WO2013EP77716
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015090453
Date:25.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3085196
Date:26.10.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015
[2016/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3085196
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/32, // H04W88/08, H04W16/08, H04W16/24, H04W16/26, H04L12/801, H04W24/04, H04W72/08, H04W88/04, H04L12/24
[2019/03]
Former International [2016/43]H04W88/08, H04W16/08, H04W16/24, H04W16/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZELLULARES NETZWERK MIT VON BENUTZEREBENE ENTKOPPELTER STEUERUNGSEBENE[2019/05]
English:CELLULAR NETWORK WITH CONTROL PLANE DECOUPLED FROM USER PLANE[2016/43]
French:RÉSEAU CELLULAIRE À PLAN DE COMMANDE DÉCOUPLÉ D'UN PLAN D'UTILISATEUR[2016/43]
Former [2016/43]ZELLULARES NETZWERK MIT VON BENUTZEREBENE ENTGEKOPPELTER STEUERUNGSEBENE
Entry into regional phase12.07.2016National basic fee paid 
12.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/43]
26.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational searchEP2533595  [ ]
 US6973054  [ ]
 WO2012004663  [ ]
 WO2012166975  [ ]
 [YA]WO2009031956  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; LINDGREN STEFAN [SE]; SJOEBERG STEN [SE]) [Y] 4-11 * page 3, line 10 - line 25 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 15 * * page 9, line 5 - page 12, line 2 * [A] 1-3
    [ ] - JUHA KORHONEN, Introduction to 3G mobile communications, ARTECH HOUSE, (2003), page 134
 [XY]  - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Connectivity Models for Small Cell Enhancement", vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130118), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-130314 SC CONNECTIVITY MODELS_R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_81/Docs/, (20130118), XP050668059 [X] 1 * paragraphs 2.3 to 3 * [Y] 2-11
 [YA]  - CATR, "Further discussion on potential issues of dual connectivity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130405), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-131314, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_81bis/Docs/, (20130405), XP050699321 [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [02.2] * [A] 1,4-11
ExaminationWO2014149921