Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2950953

EP2950953 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSOLIDATING/MOLDING NEAR NET-SHAPED COMPONENTS MADE FROM POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/50]METHOD OF CONSOLIDATING/MOLDING NEAR NET-SHAPED COMPONENTS MADE FROM POWDER
[2019/25]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/48]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MATSEN, Marc R.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code 42-32
Chicago, Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / NEGLEY, Mark A.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code 42-32
Chicago, Illinois 60606-2016 / US
03 / MILLER, Robert J.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Mail Code 42-32
Chicago, Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2015/50]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/48]
Former [2015/50]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13818945.120.12.2013
[2015/50]
WO2013US76912
Priority number, dateUS20131375860904.02.2013         Original published format: US201313758609
[2015/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014120360
Date:07.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2950953
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014
[2015/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2950953
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B22F3/14, B22F3/00, B22F3/087, H05B6/06, H05B6/10, B29C70/00, B21D26/021, B21D26/055, B22F3/105, B22F3/03, C21D1/18, C21D1/42, C21D6/00, C21D9/42
[2019/24]
Former International [2015/50]B22F3/14, B22F3/00, B22F3/087, H05B6/06, H05B6/10, B29C70/00, B21D26/021, B21D26/055, B22F3/105, B22F3/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONSOLIDIERUNG/FORMUNG VON ENDFORMNAHEN KOMPONENTEN AUS PULVER[2019/25]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSOLIDATING/MOLDING NEAR NET-SHAPED COMPONENTS MADE FROM POWDER[2019/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONSOLIDATION/MOULAGE DE COMPOSANTS DE POUDRE DE DIMENSIONS PROCHES DES DIMENSIONS FINALES[2019/25]
Former [2015/50]VERFAHREN ZUR KONSOLIDIERUNG/FORMUNG VON KOMPONENTEN MIT NETZÄHNLICHER FORM AUS PULVER
Former [2015/50]METHOD OF CONSOLIDATING/MOLDING NEAR NET-SHAPED COMPONENTS MADE FROM POWDER
Former [2015/50]PROCÉDÉ DE CONSOLIDATION/MOULAGE PRÈS DE COMPOSANTS EN FORME DE FILET FAITS DE POUDRE
Entry into regional phase24.08.2015National basic fee paid 
24.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/50]
12.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.09.2019Fee for grant paid
13.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.10.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
17.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19201556.8
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010018271  (MATSEN MARC R [US], et al) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0025] - [0040] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 1-10;
 [A]US5728309  (MATSEN MARC R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6528771