Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2855672 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2855672



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 367
05.06.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.08.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
14.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 35
14.02.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 25
18.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.09.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 27
18.09.2017 Description Search / examination 27
18.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
08.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.01.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
12.01.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
12.01.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
02.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.03.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
09.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.12.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
28.11.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.03.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
23.01.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 25
23.01.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.01.2014 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36