Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2855672


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2020  [2020/07]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
07.06.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.07.2019  [2019/28]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
29.06.2018 (Expected) grant published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.06.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.07.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2017 First examination report
26.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  10.02.2016  [2016/06]
25.12.2015 Change - classification published on  27.01.2016  [2016/04]
02.12.2015 Change - representative
31.07.2015 Change - extension states published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
29.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
06.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
26.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
29.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.2014 Change - representative
23.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication