Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2855672
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9234190Global Dossier 12.01.2016B2
US2015147753 28.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
FI20125586 30.05.2012
WO2013FI50586 30.05.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2855672Global Dossier 01.08.2018B1
EP2855672 10.02.2016A4
EP2855672 08.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
FI20125586 30.05.2012
WO2013FI50586 30.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014013127Global Dossier 23.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
FI20125586 30.05.2012