Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2855672

EP2855672 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYPERACTIVE TRANSPOSASE MUTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.02.2020  [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Savilahti, Harri
Munkkiniemen puistotie 2 B 34
00330 Helsinki / FI
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RASILA, Tiina
Linnuntie 5A
FI-02660 Espoo / FI
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Laine IP Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2018/31]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2015/15]Aalto, Juha-Matti , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab
Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13819663.930.05.2013
[2018/31]
WO2013FI50586
Priority number, dateFI2012000558630.05.2012         Original published format: FI 20125586
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014013127
Date:23.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2855672
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2855672
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/22
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HYPERAKTIVER TRANSPOSASEMUTANTEN[2015/15]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYPERACTIVE TRANSPOSASE MUTANTS[2015/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MUTANTS DE TRANSPOSASES HYPERACTIFS[2015/15]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2014National basic fee paid 
22.12.2014Search fee paid 
22.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/15]
08.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2018Fee for grant paid
14.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
[2020/07]
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]  - "SubName: Full=MuA transposase subunit-like protein {ECO:0000313|EMBL:AAV37135.1};", UniProt, (20050426), Database accession no. Q58ZD8, URL: EBI, XP002752160 [X] 1-15 * sequence . *
International search[A]WO2010099296  (TRANSPOSAGEN BIOPHARMACEUTICAL [US], et al)
 [X]  - NAIGAMWALLA D. Z. ET AL., "Mutations in Domain Illa of the Mu Transposase: Evidence Suggesting an Acitve Site Component which Interacts with the Mu-Host Junction", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 282, pages 265 - 274, XP004459737

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1998.2011
 [XP]  - RASILA T, "Functional Mapping of Mu Transposition Machinery: MuA Protein Modification and Engineering for Hyperactivity, Doctoral dissertation", DISSERTATIONES BIOCENTRI VIIKKI UNIVERSITATIS HELSINGIENSIS, UNIVERSITY OF HELSINKI, FACULTY OF BIOLOGICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES, DEPARTMENT OF BIOSCIENCES, DIVISION OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2013), XP055179586
 [A]  - PAJUNEN M. ET AL., "Universal platform for quantitative analysis of DNA transposition", MOBILE DNA, (2010), vol. 1, page 24, XP021091383

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1759-8753-1-24
 [A]  - RASILA T. S. ET AL., "Flexibility in MuA Transposase Family Protein Structures: Functional Mapping with Scanning Mutagenesis and Sequence Alignment of Protein Homologues", PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 5, page E37922, XP055179589

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0037922
 [A]  - KIM Y. C. ET AL., "N-Terminal Domain-Deleted Mu Transposase Exhibits Increased Transposition Activity with Low Target Site Preference in Modified Buffers", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 30 - 40, XP008175698

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000178019
by applicantWO2010099296
    - NAIGAMWALLA et al., Journal of Molecular Biology, (19980000), vol. 282, pages 265 - 274
    - RASILA et al., Plos One, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 5, page E37922
    - Mobile DNA II, ASM Press, (20020000), page 1204
    - FESCHOTTE C; PRITHAM EJ., "DNA transposons and the evolution of eukaryotic genomes", Annu Rev Genet, (20070000), vol. 41, pages 331 - 368
    - KAZAZIAN HH,JR., "Mobile elements: Drivers of genome evolution", Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 1626 - 1632
    - MUOTRI AR; MARCHETTO MC; COUFAL NG; GAGE FH, "The necessary junk: New functions for transposable elements", Hum Mol Genet, (20070000), vol. 16, no. 2, pages R159 - 67
    - FESCHOTTE C., "Transposable elements and the evolution of regulatory networks", Nat Rev Genet, (20080000), vol. 9, pages 397 - 405
    - SINZELLE L; IZSVAK Z; IVICS Z., "Molecular domestication of transposable elements: From detrimental parasites to useful host genes", Cell Mol Life Sci, (20090000), vol. 66, pages 1073 - 1093, XP019700825
    - "Putting mobile DNA to work: The toolbox", BOEKE JD., Mobile DNA II, ASM Press, (20020000), pages 24 - 37
    - HAYES F., "Transposon-based strategies for microbial functional genomics and proteomics", Annu Rev Genet, (20030000), vol. 37, pages 3 - 29
    - "The expanding universe of transposon technologies for gene and cell engineering", IVICS Z; IZSVAK Z., Mob DNA, (20100000), vol. 1, page 25
    - HOWE MM; BADE EG., "Molecular biology of bacteriophage mu", Science, (19750000), vol. 190, pages 624 - 632
    - MIZUUCHI K., "In vitro transposition of bacteriophage Mu: A biochemical approach to a novel replication reaction", Cell, (19830000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(83)90111-3, pages 785 - 794, XP026994526

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90111-3
    - MIZUUCHI K., "Transpositional recombination: Mechanistic insights from studies ofMu and other elements", Annu Rev Biochem, (19920000), vol. 61, pages 1011 - 1051
    - RICE P; CRAIGIE R; DAVIES DR., "Retroviral integrases and their cousins", Curr Opin Struct Biol, (19960000), vol. 6, pages 76 - 83
    - NESMELOVA IV; HACKETT PB., "DDE transposases: Structural similarity and diversity", Adv Drug Deliv Rev, (20100000), vol. 62, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2010.06.006, pages 1187 - 1195, XP027509887

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2010.06.006
    - SURETTE MG; BUCH SJ; CHACONAS G., "Transpososomes: Stable protein-DNA complexes involved in the in vitro transposition of bacteriophage Mu DNA", Cell, (19870000), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(87)90566-6, pages 253 - 262, XP023884046

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(87)90566-6
    - CRAIGIE R; MIZUUCHI K., "Transposition of mu DNA: Joining of Mu to target DNA can be uncoupled from cleavage at the ends of Mu.", Cell, (19870000), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(87)90645-3, pages 493 - 501, XP027461942

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(87)90645-3
    - BAKER TA; MIZUUCHI M; SAVILAHTI H; MIZUUCHI K., "Division of labor among monomers within the Mu transposase tetramer", Cell, (19930000), vol. 74, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(93)90519-V, pages 723 - 733, XP024246099

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(93)90519-V
    - SAVILAHTI H; RICE PA; MIZUUCHI K., "The phage Mu transpososome core: DNA requirements for assembly and function", EMBO J, (19950000), vol. 14, pages 4893 - 4903, XP001063178
    - "Transposition of phage Mu DNA", CHACONAS G; HARSHEY RM., Mobile DNA II, ASM Press., (20020000), pages 384 - 402
    - HAAPA S; TAIRA S; HEIKKINEN E; SAVILAHTI H, "An efficient and accurate integration of mini-Mu transposons in vitro: A general methodology for functional genetic analysis and molecular biology applications", Nucleic Acids Res, (19990000), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/27.13.2777, pages 2777 - 2784, XP002223238

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/27.13.2777
    - ALDAZ H; SCHUSTER E; BAKER TA., "The interwoven architecture of the Mu transposase couples DNA synapsis to catalysis", Cell, (19960000), vol. 85, pages 257 - 269
    - SAVILAHTI H; MIZUUCHI K., "Mu transpositional recombination: Donor DNA cleavage and strand transfer in trans by the Mu transposase", Cell, (19960000), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81103-4, pages 271 - 280, XP002194599

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81103-4
    - YANG J-Y; JAYARAM M; HARSHEY RM, "Positional information within the Mu transposase tetramer: Catalytic contributions of individual monomers", Cell, (19960000), vol. 85, pages 447 - 455
    - HAAPA S; SUOMALAINEN S; EERIKAINEN S; AIRAKSINEN M; PAULIN L et al., "An efficient DNA sequencing strategy based on the bacteriophage Mu in vitro DNA transposition reaction", Genome Res, (19990000), vol. 9, pages 308 - 315, XP002194598
    - ORSINI L; PAJUNEN M; HANSKI I; SAVILAHTI H., "SNP discovery by mismatch-targeting of Mu transposition", Nucleic Acids Res, (20070000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkm070, page e44, XP055208598

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm070
    - PAJUNEN M; TURAKAINEN H; POUSSU E; PERANEN J; VIHINEN M et al., "High-precision mapping of protein-protein interfaces: An integrated genetic strategy combining en masse mutagenesis and DNA-level parallel analysis on a yeast two-hybrid platform", Nucleic Acids Res, (20070000), vol. 35, page el03
    - POUSSU E; JANTTI J; SAVILAHTI H., "A gene truncation strategy generating N- and C-terminal deletion variants of proteins for functional studies: Mapping of the Seclp binding domain in yeast Msolp by a Mu in vitro transposition-based approach", Nucleic Acids Res, (20050000), vol. 33, page el04
    - POUSSU E; VIHINEN M; PAULIN L; SAVILAHTI H., "Probing the a-complementing domain of E. coli (3-galactosidase with use of an insertional pentapeptide mutagenesis strategy based on Mu in vitro DNA transposition", Proteins, (20040000), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1002/prot.10467, pages 681 - 692, XP055145069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prot.10467
    - BRADY T; ROTH SL; MALANI N; WANG GP; BERRY CC et al., "A method to sequence and quantify DNA integration for monitoring outcome in gene therapy", Nucleic Acids Res, (20110000), vol. 39, page e72
    - KRUPOVIC M; VILEN H; BAMFORD JKH; KIVELA HM; AALTO J-M et al., "Genome characterization of lipid-containing marine bacteriophage PM2 by transposon insertion mutagenesis", J Virol, (20060000), vol. 80, pages 9270 - 9278
    - VILEN H; AALTO J-M; KASSINEN A; PAULIN L; SAVILAHTI H., "A direct transposon insertion tool for modification and functional analysis of viral genomes", J Virol, (20030000), vol. 77, pages 123 - 134
    - LAMBERG A; NIEMINEN S; QIAO M; SAVILAHTI H., "Efficient insertion mutagenesis strategy for bacterial genomes involving electroporation of in vitro-assembled DNA transposition complexes of bacteriophage Mu", Appl Environ Microbiol, (20020000), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1128/AEM.68.2.705-712.2002, pages 705 - 712, XP002980043

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.2.705-712.2002
    - PAJUNEN MI; PULLIAINEN AT; FINNE J; SAVILAHTI H., "Generation of transposon insertion mutant libraries for Gram-positive bacteria by electroporation of phage Mu DNA transposition complexes", Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 151, pages 1209 - 1218
    - PAATERO AO; TURAKAINEN H; HAPPONEN LJ; OLSSON C; PALOMAKI T et al., "Bacteriophage Mu integration in yeast and mammalian genomes", Nucleic Acids Res, (20080000), vol. 36, page el48
    - NAKAYAMA C; TEPLOW DB; HARSHEY RM, "Structural domains in phage Mu transposase: Identification of the site-specific DNA-binding domain", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 1809 - 1813
    - CLUBB RT; OMICHINSKI JG; SAVILAHTI H; MIZUUCHI K; GRONENBOM AM et al., "A novel class of winged helix-turn-helix protein: The DNA-binding domain of Mu transposase", Structure, (19940000), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0969-2126(94)00107-3, pages 1041 - 1048, XP024248007

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(94)00107-3
    - CLUBB RT; SCHUMACHER S; MIZUUCHI K; GRONENBORN AM; CLORE GM., "Solution structure of the Iy subdomain of the Mu end DNA-binding domain of phage Mu transposase.", J Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 273, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1997.1312, pages 19 - 25, XP004461387

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1997.1312
    - SCHUMACHER S; CLUBB RT; CAI M; MIZUUCHI K; CLORE GM et al., EMBO J, (19970000), vol. 16, pages 7532 - 7541
    - RICE P; MIZUUCHI K., "Structure of the bacteriophage Mu transposase core: A common structural motif for DNA transposition and retroviral integration", Cell, (19950000), vol. 82, pages 209 - 220
    - LEUNG PC; TEPLOW DB; HARSHEY RM., "Interaction of distinct domains in Mu transposase with Mu DNA ends and an internal transpositional enhancer", Nature, (19890000), vol. 338, pages 656 - 658
    - MIZUUCHI M; MIZUUCHI K., "Efficient Mu transposition requires interaction of transposase with a DNA sequence at the Mu operator: Implications for regulation", Cell, (19890000), vol. 58, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(89)90854-4, pages 399 - 408, XP024244637

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(89)90854-4
    - BAKER TA; LUO L., "Identification of residues in the Mu transposase essential for catalysis", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 6654 - 6658
    - KREMENTSOVA E; GIFFIN MJ; PINCUS D; BAKER TA., "Mutational analysis of the Mu transposase: Contributions of two distinct regions of domain II to recombination", J Biol Chem, (19980000), vol. 273, pages 31358 - 31365
    - WU Z; CHACONAS G., "A novel DNA binding and nuclease activity in domain III of Mu transposase: Evidence for a catalytic region involved in donor cleavage", EMBO J, (19950000), vol. 14, pages 3835 - 3843
    - CHOI W; HARSHEY RM., "DNA repair by the cryptic endonuclease activity of Mu transposase", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20100000), vol. 107, pages 10014 - 10019
    - HARSHEY RM; CUNEO SD., "Carboxyl-terminal mutants of phage Mu transposase", J Genet, (19860000), vol. 65, pages 159 - 174
    - BAKER TA; MIZUUCHI M; MIZUUCHI K., "MuB protein allosterically activates strand transfer by the transposase of phage Mu", Cell, (19910000), vol. 65, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(91)90552-A, pages 1003 - 1013, XP023908716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(91)90552-A
    - LEUNG PC; HARSHEY RM., "Two mutations of phage Mu transposase that affect strand transfer or interactions with B protein lie in distinct polypeptide domains", J Mol Biol, (19910000), vol. 219, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(91)90561-J, pages 189 - 199, XP024009710

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(91)90561-J
    - WU Z; CHACONAS G., "Flanking host sequences can exert an inhibitory effect on the cleavage step of the in vitro Mu DNA strand transfer reaction", J Biol Chem, (19920000), vol. 267, pages 9552 - 9558
    - LEVCHENKO I; LUO L; BAKER TA., "Disassembly of the Mu transposase tetramer by the ClpX chaperone", Genes Dev, (19950000), vol. 9, pages 2399 - 2408
    - PAJUNEN MI; RASILA TS; HAPPONEN LJ; LAMBERG A; HAAPA-PAANANEN S et al., "Universal platform for quantitative analysis of DNA transposition", Mob DNA, (20100000), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1186/1759-8753-1-24, page 24, XP021091383

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1759-8753-1-24
    - KIM YC; MORRISON SL., "N-terminal domain-deleted Mu transposase exhibits increased transposition activity with low target site preference in modified buffers", J Mol Microbiol Biotechnol, (20090000), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1159/000178019, pages 30 - 40, XP008175698

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000178019
    - RASILA TS; PAJUNEN MI; SAVILAHTI H., "Critical evaluation of random mutagenesis by error-prone polymerase chain reaction protocols, Escherichia coli mutator strain, and hydroxylamine treatment", Anal Biochem, (20090000), vol. 388, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ab.2009.02.008, pages 71 - 80, XP026081388

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2009.02.008
    - GRANT SG; JESSEE J; BLOOM FR; HANAHAN D., "Differential plasmid rescue from transgenic mouse DNAs into Escherichia coli methylation-restriction mutants", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 4645 - 4649
    - MEISSNER PS; SISK WP; BERMAN ML., "Bacteriophage lambda cloning system for the construction of directional cDNA libraries", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 4171 - 4175, XP001314856
    - SAMBROOK J; RUSSELL DW., Molecular cloning : A laboratory manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (20010000), page 2344
    - HANAHAN D; JESSEE J; BLOOM FR., "Plasmid transformation of Escherichia coli and other bacteria", Methods Enzymol, (19910000), vol. 204, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(91)04006-A, pages 63 - 113, XP001071125

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(91)04006-A
    - BRADFORD MM., "A rapid and sensitive method for the quantitation of microgram quantities of protein utilizing the principle of protein-dye binding", Anal Biochem, (19760000), vol. 72, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(76)90527-3, pages 248 - 254, XP025650297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(76)90527-3
    - REZNIKOFF WS., "Tn5 as a model for understanding DNA transposition", Mol Microbiol, (20030000), vol. 47, pages 1199 - 1206
    - MATES L; CHUAH MK; BELAY E; JERCHOW B; MANOJ N et al., "Molecular evolution of a novel hyperactive Sleeping Beauty transposase enables robust stable gene transfer in vertebrates", Nat Genet, (20090000), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1038/ng.343, pages 753 - 761, XP055041328

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.343
    - GERMON S; BOUCHET N; CASTERET S; CARPENTIER G; ADET J et al., "Genetica", Mariner Mosl transposase optimization by rational mutagenesis, (20090000), vol. 137, pages 265 - 276
    - BEALL EL; MAHONEY MB; RIO DC., "Identification and analysis of a hyperactive mutant form of Drosophila P-element transposase", Genetics, (20020000), vol. 162, pages 217 - 227