Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2874651

EP2874651 - COMPOUNDS FOR TARGETED IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Birdie Biopharmaceuticals Inc.
Sertus Chambers
P.O. Box 2547
Cassia Court
Camana Bay
Grand Cayman / KY
[2016/41]
Former [2015/22]For all designated states
Shanghai Birdie Biotech Inc.
1-4-13
1 Xiushui Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100600 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Lixin
1-4-13
1 Xiushui Road
Chaoyang District
Beijing 100600 / CN
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Mitchell, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date13820359.116.07.2013
WO2013CN79441
Priority number, dateCN20121024848118.07.2012         Original published format: CN201210248481
[2015/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014012479
Date:23.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2874651
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04
[2016/09]
Former International [2015/22]A61K39/00, A61K47/48, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN FÜR GEZIELTE IMMUNTHERAPIE[2015/22]
English:COMPOUNDS FOR TARGETED IMMUNOTHERAPY[2015/22]
French:COMPOSÉS POUR IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE CIBLÉE[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2015National basic fee paid 
16.01.2015Search fee paid 
16.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
14.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2009093250  (GAVISH GALILEE BIO APPL LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * example 1 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2009018500  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * examples 3,5,9 *;
 [X]WO2006091720  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * examples 1,6 *;
 [X]WO2004062603  (ARIZEKE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * examples 3,4,9 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2004029206  (VACCINEX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * examples 1-3 * * claim - *;
 [X]WO2006020266  (ALEXION PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14-19 * claim - *;
 [I]WO2008097870  (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [I] 1-11,14-19 * claim - * * figure - *
 [X]  - MELANI CECILIA ET AL, "Targeting of interleukin 2 to human ovarian carcinoma by fusion with a single-chain Fv of antifolate receptor antibody", CANCER RESEARCH, (19980915), vol. 58, no. 18, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4146 - 4154, XP002421527 [X] 1-11,14-19 * abstract * * figure - * * page 4152 *
 [I]  - BONIFAZ L ET AL, "Efficient targeting of protein antigen to the dendritic cell receptor DEC-205 in the steady state leads to antigen presentation on major histocompatibility complex class I products and peripheral CD8+ T cell tolerance", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20021216), vol. 196, no. 12, doi:10.1084/JEM.20021598, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1627 - 1638, XP002983189 [I] 1-11,14-19 * abstract * * figure - * * page 1635 - page 1636 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20021598
 [I]  - CARTER ROBERT W ET AL, "Preferential induction of CD4+ T cell responses through in vivo targeting of antigen to dendritic cell-associated C-type lectin-1", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20060815), vol. 177, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2276 - 2284, XP002503158 [I] 1-11,14-19 * abstract * * page 2277, column r *
International search[X]  - BETTING D.J. ET AL., "In vivo eradication of a rituximab-resistant human CD20+ B cell lymphom by rituximab-CpG oligodeoxynucleotide conjugate is mediated by natural killer cells and complement", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 114, no. 22, page 302, XP055182392
 [X]  - TIMMERMAN J. ET AL., "In vivo activity of rituximab-CpG oligodeoxynucleotide conjugate against rituximab-resistant human CD20+ B-cell lymphoma", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2009), vol. 7, no. 15., page 8529, XP055182397