Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2874716

EP2874716 - RING STIX GAME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2018  [2018/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mueller, Steven T.
319 Windward Island
Clearwater, FL 33767 / US
[2015/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/22]
Representative(s)Chaillot, Geneviève , et al
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/22]Chaillot, Geneviève , et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13820638.817.07.2013
WO2013US50785
Priority number, dateUS20121355213618.07.2012         Original published format: US201213552136
[2015/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014014973
Date:23.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2874716
Date:27.05.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2014
[2015/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU23.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A63B67/06, A63B65/00, A63B67/08, A63B59/30, A63H33/18, A63H33/00
[2017/23]
Former International [2016/07]A63B67/06, A63B65/00, A63B67/08, A63B59/30
Former International [2015/22]A63B67/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
TitleGerman:SPIELSYSTEM MIT RINGSTÄBEN[2015/22]
English:RING STIX GAME SYSTEM[2015/22]
French:SYSTÈME DE JEU RING STIX[2015/22]
Entry into regional phase09.02.2015National basic fee paid 
09.02.2015Search fee paid 
09.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
09.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
11.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/13]
08.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]USD650867S  (MUELLER STEVEN T [US]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US4157828  (COSMOPULOS STAVROS [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 46 - line 50; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US5181875  (HASEGAWA GARY K [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 42; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2371567  (CHARLES WILSON) [A] 1-8 * page 1, column 1, line 41 - page 2, column 1, line 7; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]CA1026393  (MCCALLUM DAVID F) [A] 6,8 * page 2, line 1 - line 23; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2477895  (PICARD DU CHAMBON GEOFFROI [FR]) [A] 6,8 * page 2, line 14 - line 28; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]BE1001305  (NELISSEN KOENRAAD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 35; figures 1-16 *
International search[A]US2011074109  (SAMUEL L. WEPTH);
 [A]KR20060096601  (CHOI, JIN WOOK);
 [A]RU45109U  (000 ''SPETSSTALPRODUCT'');
 [A]RU2246356  (FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE ''VORONEZHSKIY MEKHA);
 [A]CN201139918Y  (CHEN B)
by applicantUSD650867S