Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2874716


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
07.11.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2017 Change - classification published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
15.06.2017 Change - classification published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
21.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.09.2016 Amendment by applicant
03.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - classification published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
25.09.2015 Change - extension states published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
04.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Request for examination filed published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
12.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2015 Change - representative
14.02.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication