Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2935905

EP2935905 - HYDRAULIC DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE WITH INTEGRATED PRESSURE COMPENSATING VALVE AND MOTOR VEHICLE INCLUDING SUCH A DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/44]HYDRAULIC DISTRIBUTOR WITH IN-BUILT PRESSURE COMPENSATOR, AND MOTORIZED VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A DISTRIBUTOR
[2016/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fluid-System
4, rue Moulin Cuzieux
42420 Lorette / FR
[2016/42]
Former [2015/44]For all designated states
Fluid-System (Sarl)
4, Rue Moulin Cuzieux
42420 Lorette / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PAYRE, Christophe
435 Chemin de l'Indicateur
F-84460 Cheval Blanc / FR
02 / LAGORS, Frédéric
645 Route du Village
Les Gonettes
F-38200 Serpaize / FR
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2017/10]
Former [2015/44]Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
Application number, filing date13820798.011.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013FR53029
Priority number, dateFR2012006227918.12.2012         Original published format: FR 1262279
[2015/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014096630
Date:26.06.2014
Language:FR
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2935905
Date:28.10.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2935905
Date:08.03.2017
Language:FR
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:F15B13/04
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHES WEGEVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTER DRUCKWAAGE SOWIE KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN WEGEVENTIL[2016/37]
English:HYDRAULIC DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE WITH INTEGRATED PRESSURE COMPENSATING VALVE AND MOTOR VEHICLE INCLUDING SUCH A DIRECTIONAL CONTROL VALVE[2016/37]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR HYDRAULIQUE À BALANCE DE PRESSION INTÉGRÉE AINSI QU'UN ENGIN MOTORISÉ ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISTRIBUTEUR[2015/44]
Former [2015/44]HYDRAULISCHER VERTEILER MIT INTEGRIERTEM DRUCKKOMPENSATOR UND MIT SOLCH EINEM VERTEILER AUSGESTATTETES FAHRZEUG
Former [2015/44]HYDRAULIC DISTRIBUTOR WITH IN-BUILT PRESSURE COMPENSATOR, AND MOTORIZED VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A DISTRIBUTOR
Entry into regional phase10.07.2015National basic fee paid 
10.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
21.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.01.2017Fee for grant paid
20.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2013
AT08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
MT08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
MT08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/43]AT08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MT08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[AD]FR2544405  (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]FR2578002  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 32 - page 10, line 20 *
 [A]DE102007054134  (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] *
 EP2375114  [ ] (REXROTH)
 FR2544405  [ ] (LINDE)
 US5186000  [ ] (HITACHI)