Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2936107

EP2936107 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AND/OR DETERMINING A PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.06.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxipack B.V.
Ringveste 3 b
3992 DD Houten / NL
[2015/44]
Inventor(s)01 / AARTS, Mathias Leonardus Cornelus
c/o Zweerslaan 7
NL-3723 HN Bilthoven / NL
 [2015/44]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13821529.819.12.2013
[2015/44]
WO2013NL50926
Priority number, dateNL2012201001619.12.2012         Original published format: NL 2010016
[2015/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014098594
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2936107
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/36
[2015/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/44]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG UND/ODER BESTIMMUNG EINES DRUCKS[2015/44]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AND/OR DETERMINING A PRESSURE[2015/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL SERVANT À CONTRÔLER ET/OU À DÉTERMINER UNE PRESSION[2015/44]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2015National basic fee paid 
15.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/44]
23.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]WO2007122201  (INTERPRISE BRUSSELS S A [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-13,23-26,34-37,40,41 * page 5, line 24 - page 10, line 14; figures 1,2 * [A] 8,9,32,33 [Y] 39 [I] 3-7,14-22,27-31,38,42;
 [Y]NL1032367C  (INTERPRISE BRUSSELS S A [BE]) [Y] 39 * figures 1a-1c *;
 [XI]DE19813288  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,11,23-25,34-36,40-42 * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,3 * [I] 12-22,26,37,38;
 [A]DE29709635U  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-42 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 14; figure 1 *