blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2877186

EP2877186 - METHOD OF PROMOTING WOUND HEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.08.2017  [2017/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agency For Science, Technology And Research (A*star)
1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis
Singapore 138632 / SG
[2015/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SAMPATH, Prabha
c/o Institute of Medical Biology
8A Biomedical Grove
06-06 Immunos
Singapore 138648 / SG
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)HGF
Delta House
50 West Nile Street
Glasgow G1 2NP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/23]Wilson, Gary
HGF Limited
Delta House
50 West Nile Street
Glasgow G1 2NP / GB
Application number, filing date13822123.929.07.2013
WO2013SG00316
Priority number, dateSG2012000561427.07.2012         Original published format: SG 201205614
[2015/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014017987
Date:30.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2877186
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU30.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/7088, A61K38/17, A61P17/02
[2015/23]
CPC:
A61K31/7088 (EP,US); A61K38/1709 (EP,US); A61K38/1841 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP); C12N15/113 (EP,US); C12N15/1136 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP); G01N33/6887 (US); C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US); C12N2310/315 (EP,US); C12N2310/316 (EP,US);
C12N2310/322 (EP,US); C12N2310/3231 (EP,US); C12N2310/3517 (EP,US);
C12N2320/31 (EP,US); C12Q2600/158 (EP); C12Q2600/178 (EP);
G01N2333/4704 (EP,US); G01N2800/20 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A61K31/7088, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3525 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON WUNDHEILUNG[2015/23]
English:METHOD OF PROMOTING WOUND HEALING[2015/23]
French:MÉTHODE FACILITANT LA CICATRISATION DES PLAIES[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase28.01.2015National basic fee paid 
28.01.2015Search fee paid 
28.01.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
28.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/35]
05.04.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/35]
Divisional application(s)EP17158057.4  / EP3195869
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - TZU-LING SUNG ET AL, "miR-198 Inhibits HIV-1 Gene Expression and Replication in Monocytes and Its Mechanism of Action Appears To Involve Repression of Cyclin T1", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20090116), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1000263, page e1000263, XP055247999 [X] 1,2,20,21,23 * the whole document * * paragraph [03.4] * [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1000263
 [Y]  - R. BLAKYTNY ET AL, "The molecular biology of chronic wounds and delayed healing in diabetes", DIABETIC MEDICINE., GB, (20060601), vol. 23, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1464-5491.2006.01773.x, ISSN 0742-3071, pages 594 - 608, XP055247859 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document * * pages 596, 597 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1464-5491.2006.01773.x
 [Y]  - JACK W PENN ET AL, "The role of the TGF-[beta] family in wound healing, burns and scarring: a review", INT J BURN TRAUMA, (20120205), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 18 - 28, XP055247943 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Y. GENG ET AL, "Follistatin-like 1 (Fstl1) is a bone morphogenetic protein (BMP) 4 signaling antagonist in controlling mouse lung development", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20110411), vol. 108, no. 17, doi:10.1073/pnas.1007293108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7058 - 7063, XP055247871 [A] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1007293108
 [Y]  - MARCEL FELDER ET AL, "Microfluidic wound-healing assay to assess the regenerative effect of HGF on wounded alveolar epithelium", LAB ON A CHIP, GB, (20120201), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.1039/C1LC20879A, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 640 - 646, XP055247833 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C1LC20879A
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Secret To Healing Chronic Wounds Might Lie In Tiny Pieces Of Silent RNA", (20120427), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120427121217/http://researchnews.osu.edu/archive/mir210wounds.htm, (20160205), XP055248177 [A] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document *
 [T]  - GOPINATH M. SUNDARAM ET AL, "'See-saw' expression of microRNA-198 and FSTL1 from a single transcript in wound healing", NATURE, (20130210), vol. 495, no. 7439, doi:10.1038/nature11890, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 103 - 106, XP055184125 [T] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11890
 [A]  - YUK C. CHAN ET AL, "miR-210: The Master Hypoxamir", MICROCIRCULATION, (20120327), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1111/j.1549-8719.2011.00154.x, ISSN 1073-9688, pages 215 - 223, XP055057109 [A] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1549-8719.2011.00154.x
 [A]  - TZU-LING SUNG ET AL, "miR-198 Inhibits HIV-1 Gene Expression and Replication in Monocytes and Its Mechanism of Action Appears To Involve Repression of Cyclin T1", PLOS PATHOGENS, (20090116), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.ppat.1000263, page e1000263, XP055247999 [A] 1-3,5-8,10-14,20-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.ppat.1000263
 [Y]  - LARA-PEZZI ENRIQUE ET AL, "Expression of Follistatin-Related Genes Is Altered in Heart Failure", ENDOCRINOLOGY, THE ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, US, vol. 149, no. 11, doi:10.1210/EN.2008-0151, ISSN 0013-7227, (20081101), pages 5822 - 5827, (20080710), XP008102240 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10,20-23 * the whole document * * page 5822 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/EN.2008-0151
 [Y]  - M Wankell ET AL, "The activin binding proteins follistatin and follistatin-related protein are differentially regulated in vitro and during cutaneous wound repair Introduction", Journal of Endocrinology, (20010101), pages 385 - 395, URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.320.9059&rep=rep1&type=pdf, XP055287308 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10,20-23 * the whole document * * pages 392-393 *
 [Y]  - HARRISON C A ET AL, "Antagonists of activin signaling: mechanisms and potential biological applications", TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 1043-2760, (20050301), pages 73 - 78, (20050301), XP027790070 [Y] 1-3,5-8,10,20-23 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 77 *
International search[A]US2009291907  (ESAU CHRISTINE [US], et al);
 [A]WO2006137941  (AMBION INC [US], et al);
 [T]  - SUNDARAM, G. M. ET AL., "See-saw' Expression of MicroRNA-198 and FSTL1 from a Single Transcript in Wound Healing'", NATURE, (20130307), vol. 495, pages 103 - 106, XP055184125

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature11890
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.