blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2878632

EP2878632 - ROOM-TEMPERATURE-CURABLE POLYORGANOSILOXANE COMPOSITION AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Momentive Performance Materials Japan LLC
5-2-20, Akasaka Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-6112 / JP
[2015/23]
Inventor(s)01 / IIDA Isao
c/o MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS JAPAN LLC
5-2-20 Akasaka
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-6112 / JP
02 / MORITA Yasuhito
c/o MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS JAPAN LLC
5-2-20 Akasaka
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-6112 / JP
 [2015/23]
Representative(s)Granleese, Rhian Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/23]Granleese, Rhian Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date13822351.619.07.2013
[2017/15]
WO2013JP69644
Priority number, dateJP2012016725527.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012167255
[2015/23]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2014017397
Date:30.01.2014
Language:JA
[2014/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2878632
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2878632
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.01.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2015
ClassificationIPC:C08L83/04, C08K5/5415, C08K5/56, C09D7/12, C09D183/04
[2015/23]
CPC:
C09D7/63 (EP,US); C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US); C08K5/0091 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5419 (EP,KR,US); C08L83/14 (EP,KR,US); C09D183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/06 (US); C09D183/14 (EP,KR,US); C09D7/40 (KR);
H05K1/181 (US); C08L2203/202 (KR); H05K2201/10015 (US);
H05K2201/20 (US); Y10T428/31663 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
C08L83/14, C08L83/00 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEI RAUMTEMPERATUR HÄRTBARE POLYORGANOSILOXANZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ELEKTRISCHE/ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2015/23]
English:ROOM-TEMPERATURE-CURABLE POLYORGANOSILOXANE COMPOSITION AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC APPARATUS[2015/23]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLYORGANOSILOXANE DURCISSABLE À LA TEMPÉRATURE AMBIANTE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE/ÉLECTRONIQUE[2015/23]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2015Translation filed 
26.02.2015National basic fee paid 
26.02.2015Search fee paid 
26.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
24.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2017Fee for grant paid
02.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2016
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.07.2013
AL12.04.2017
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
MK12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
PT12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
TR12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/28]HU19.07.2013
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
MK12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
PT12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
TR12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2020/15]HU19.07.2013
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
MK12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
TR12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2019/52]HU19.07.2013
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
MK12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2019/47]HU19.07.2013
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU19.07.2013
AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2019/30]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
LU19.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
IE19.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
GB19.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
IT12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RS12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
ES12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NL12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL12.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007282047  (KIMURA TSUNEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* example 1 *
International search[A]JP2004536920  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007106946  (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC);
 [A]JP2010084063  (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC)
by applicantJPH07173435
 JPH07238259
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.